This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2021 at 09:52:17 (UTC).

Brian Alberto Valencia et al v. Ford Motor Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 Brian Alberto Valencia filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Percy Anderson, John D. Early and John A. Kronstadt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06717

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John D. Early

Presiding Judges

Percy Anderson

John A. Kronstadt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brian Alberto Valencia

Rene Valencia

Defendants

Ford Motor Company

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Y Jacobson

Attorney at Quill and Arrow LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Athena Bao Nhi Nguyen

Attorney at Quill and Arrow LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorney

Matthew M Proudfoot

Attorney at Gates Conter Guy Proudfoot and Muench LLP

38 Discovery Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#14

(#14) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#13

(#13) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson remanding case to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case number 21STCV26777. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-06717 PA(JDEx). (rn) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/5/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2021 at 1:30 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (droj) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (droj) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

1 #2

Answer to Complaint - State Court

1 #1

Summons & Complaint - State Court

1 #1

Main Document

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson remanding case to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case number 21STCV26777. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-06717 PA(JDEx). (rn) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER ISSUED ON August 20, 2021 (DKT. #10 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Scheduling Conference will be taken under submission after the Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report is filed. No appearance by counsel will be necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (droj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/5/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2021 at 1:30 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (droj) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (droj) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Filed in State Court on 8/19/21 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Brian Alberto Valencia, Rene Valencia. Filed in State Court on 7/31/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV26777 Receipt No: ACACDC-31839292 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Millard Proudfoot