This case was last updated from PACER on 12/30/2019 at 08:10:23 (UTC).

Brewster et al v. Berger et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 Brewster filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Berger. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James C. Dever, III and Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00037

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

James C. Dever, III

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Larry E. Norman

Billy Joe Brewster, Jr.

Thomas L. Hill

Thomas W. Hill

Defendants

Phillip E. Berger

David C. Black

Timothy K. Moore

Stella Anderson

Jeff Carmon

Kenneth Raymond

Karen Brinson Bell

Damon Circosta

Intervenor Defendants

Richard R. Crews

Gettys Cohen Jr.

Donald Rumph

John Balla

Lilly Nicole Quick

Virginia Walters Brien

Kathleen Barnes

Shawn Rush

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Neal Hunter, Jr.

Attorney at Higgins Benjamin, PLLC

301 N. Elm St., Suite 800

Greensboro, NC 27401

Conrad Boyd Sturges, III

Attorney at Davis, Sturges, & Tomlinson

P. O. Drawer 708

Louisburg, NC 27549

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Douglas McKnight

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

P.O. Box 31608

Raleigh, NC 27622

Phillip J. Strach

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

P.O. Box 31608

Raleigh, NC 27622

Alyssa Riggins

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

P.O. Box 31608

Raleigh, NC 27622

Paul M. Cox

Attorney at NC Department of Justice

Post Office Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

Stephanie Ann Brennan

Attorney at North Carolina Deptartment of Justice

114 West Edenton Street, 9001 Mail Service Center, Post Office Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

Amar Majmundar

Attorney at North Carolina Deptartment of Justice

114 West Edenton Street, 9001 Mail Service Center, Post Office Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Aria C. Branch

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 13Th Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005-3960

Marc E. Elias

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 13Th Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005-3960

Uzoma N. Nkwonta

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 13Th Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005-3960

Daniel F. Jacobson

Attorney at Arnold & Porter

601 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

Abha Khanna

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Narendra K. Ghosh

Attorney at Patterson Harkavy LLP

100 Europa Drive, Suite 420

Chapel Hill, NC 27517

 

Court Documents

#1

NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Affidavit

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Preliminary Injunction

#2

Notice to Counsel regarding: #2 Notice of Related Case. All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice filed by Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas L. Hill, Larry E. Norman CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Hunter, Robert) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Paul M. Cox on behalf of Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, David C. Black, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Kenneth Raymond. (Cox, Paul) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice of Related Case filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, David C. Black, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Kenneth Raymond . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Int-Def's Brief Opposing Preliminary Injunction) (Cox, Paul) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit Int-Def's Brief Opposing Preliminary Injunction

#46

(#46) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas W. Hill, Larry E. Norman as to All Defendants. (Hunter, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#22

(#39) RESPONSE to Motion regarding #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Phillip E. Berger, Timothy K. Moore. (Strach, Phillip) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#45

(#45) ORDER denying #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/2/2019. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#44

(#44) REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas W. Hill, Larry E. Norman. (Hunter, Robert) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#43

(#43) STATE BOARD'S OPPOSITION regarding #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction CORRECTED filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, David C. Black, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Kenneth Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Harper, Order on Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit B Harper, Opposition to Motion for P.I., #3 Exhibit C Harper, Nov. 20, 2019 Order, #4 Exhibit D, Common Cause, Bell Affidavit, #5 Exhibit E, McCrory v. Harris, Emergency Application, #6 Exhibit F, Alexander, Hearing Transcript) (Brennan, Stephanie) Modified on 11/26/2019 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.). (Entered: 11/25/2019)

43 #4

Exhibit D, Common Cause, Bell Affidavit

43 #5

Exhibit E, McCrory v. Harris, Emergency Application

43 #6

Exhibit F, Alexander, Hearing Transcript

43 #1

Exhibit A Harper, Order on Injunctive Relief

43 #2

Exhibit B Harper, Opposition to Motion for P.I.

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas W. Hill, Larry E. Norman as to All Defendants. (Hunter, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ORDER denying #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/2/2019. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas W. Hill, Larry E. Norman. (Hunter, Robert) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) STATE BOARD'S OPPOSITION regarding #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction CORRECTED filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, David C. Black, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Kenneth Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Harper, Order on Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit B Harper, Opposition to Motion for P.I., #3 Exhibit C Harper, Nov. 20, 2019 Order, #4 Exhibit D, Common Cause, Bell Affidavit, #5 Exhibit E, McCrory v. Harris, Emergency Application, #6 Exhibit F, Alexander, Hearing Transcript) (Brennan, Stephanie) Modified on 11/26/2019 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.). (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER regarding #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The court DIRECTS the parties to deliver to the court a courtesy copy of the documents filed by that party, and all outstanding motions and briefs related thereto, including all exhibits and attachments thereto, tabbed by docket entry and exhibit number, but not bound, no later than ten (10) days from the date of the text order, or sooner if possible. Such courtesy copies are to be addressed for delivery to the Honorable Louise W. Flanagan, United States District Court, Eastern District of North Carolina, ATTN: Ms. Sandra Collins, 413 Middle St., New Bern, NC 28560. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/22/2019. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #42 ** STATE BOARD'S OPPOSITION regarding #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, David C. Black, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Kenneth Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Order, #2 Exhibit B Intervenor Brief, #3 Exhibit C Order, #4 Exhibit D Bell Aff, #5 Exhibit E Emergency Stay App, #6 Exhibit F Transcript) (Brennan, Stephanie) Modified on 11/22/2019 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.). Modified on 11/26/2019 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) INTERVENORS' MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Virginia Walters Brien, David Wright Brown, Gettys Cohen Jr., Richard R. Crews, Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr., Joseph Thomas Gates, Rebecca Harper, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mark S. Peters, Lilly Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Shawn Rush. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Intervenors' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Legislative Transcript, #3 Exhibit B - Legislative Transcript, #4 Exhibit C - Harper Order) (Nkwonta, Uzoma) Modified on 11/22/2019 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) INTERVENORS' BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS #41 AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION regarding #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Virginia Walters Brien, David Wright Brown, Gettys Cohen Jr., Richard R. Crews, Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr., Joseph Thomas Gates, Rebecca Harper, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mark S. Peters, Lilly Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Shawn Rush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legislative Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Legislative Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - Harper Order) (Nkwonta, Uzoma) Modified on 11/22/2019 (Collins, S.). Modified on 11/22/2019 to create docket entry relationship to #41 and revise docket text. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) RESPONSE to Motion regarding #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Phillip E. Berger, Timothy K. Moore. (Strach, Phillip) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Related Case filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, David C. Black, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Kenneth Raymond . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Int-Def's Brief Opposing Preliminary Injunction) (Cox, Paul) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Paul M. Cox on behalf of Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, David C. Black, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Kenneth Raymond. (Cox, Paul) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel regarding: #2 Notice of Related Case. All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice filed by Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas L. Hill, Larry E. Norman CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Hunter, Robert) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Related Case filed by REBECCA HARPER . (Jones, Robert) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Billy Joe Brewster, Jr., Thomas L. Hill, Larry E. Norman. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5166281.), filed by THOMAS L. HILL, LARRY E. NORMAN, BILLY JOE BREWSTER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit) (Hunter, Robert) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.