This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 08:03:22 (UTC).

Brewer-Kronberg v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Brewer-Kronberg filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is R. Brooke Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03188

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Brooke Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruth Ann Brewer-Kronberg

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Scott Krieger

Attorney at Noel & Krieger, LLC

165 South Union Boulevard, Union Tower, #555

Lakewood, CO 80228

Defendant Attorney

Jack M. Englert, Jr.

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP-Greenwood Village

6380 South Fiddlers Green Circle, Suite 500

Greenwood Village, CO 80111-2800

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6989245)Attorney Michael Scott Krieger added to party Ruth Ann Brewer-Kronberg(pty:pla), filed by Ruth Ann Brewer-Kronberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Krieger, Michael) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit A

6 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Df's MFET

#2

(#2) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Life Insurance Company of North America re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Ruth Ann Brewer-Kronberg. (Krieger, Michael) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/13/19. (rbjsec.) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Df's MFET)(Englert, Jack) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

4 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Life Insurance Company of North America's answer is due 1/10/2020. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/17/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Df's MFET)(Englert, Jack) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/13/19. (rbjsec.) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Life Insurance Company of North America re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Ruth Ann Brewer-Kronberg. (Krieger, Michael) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6989245)Attorney Michael Scott Krieger added to party Ruth Ann Brewer-Kronberg(pty:pla), filed by Ruth Ann Brewer-Kronberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Krieger, Michael) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.