This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2023 at 08:51:53 (UTC).

Brett v. Shvasai Holdings, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 Brett filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Shvasai Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00018

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph P. Brett

Defendants

Shvasai Holdings, LLC

SHVA Inc.

Pareshkumar Patel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas B. Welmaker

Defendant Attorney

Michael V. Galo, Jr.

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joseph P. Brett. (Welmaker, Douglas) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by Joseph P. Brett. (Welmaker, Douglas) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Pareshkumar Patel, SHVA Inc., Shvasai Holdings, LLC. (dm) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph P. Brett. Pareshkumar Patel served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. (Welmaker, Douglas) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#6

(#6) DEFENDANTS' ORIGINAL ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Michael V. Galo, Jr added to party Pareshkumar Patel(pty:dft), Attorney Michael V. Galo, Jr added to party SHVA Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael V. Galo, Jr added to party Shvasai Holdings, LLC (pty:dft) by Pareshkumar Patel, SHVA Inc., Shvasai Holdings, LLC.(Galo, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

#7

(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SHVA Inc., Shvasai Holdings, LLC. (Galo, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SHVA Inc., Shvasai Holdings, LLC. (Galo, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEFENDANTS' ORIGINAL ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Michael V. Galo, Jr added to party Pareshkumar Patel(pty:dft), Attorney Michael V. Galo, Jr added to party SHVA Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael V. Galo, Jr added to party Shvasai Holdings, LLC (pty:dft) by Pareshkumar Patel, SHVA Inc., Shvasai Holdings, LLC.(Galo, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph P. Brett. Pareshkumar Patel served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. (Welmaker, Douglas) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Pareshkumar Patel, SHVA Inc., Shvasai Holdings, LLC. (dm) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by Joseph P. Brett. (Welmaker, Douglas) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joseph P. Brett. (Welmaker, Douglas) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell. (cr5) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cr5) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16926032), filed by Joseph P Brett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Welmaker, Douglas) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less