This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2021 at 09:08:02 (UTC).

Bresheare et al v. Gilead Sciences Inc

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 Bresheare filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Gilead Sciences Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stanley A Bastian. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00208

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley A Bastian

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vaughn L Bresheare

John Doe 27

Defendant

Gilead Sciences Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steve W Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 2Nd Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorney

Hunter K Ahern

Attorney at Shook Hardy Bacon LLP - Seattle

701 5Th Avenue, Suite 6800

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER GRANTING #5 JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Case transferred to the Northern District of California. This file is CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LTR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

5 #1

Exhibit A

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) ORDER ACCEPTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. The parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Gilead Sciences, Inc. to Respond to Complaint, ECF No. #3 , is accepted and entered into the record. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No. #1 , on or before August 20, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LTR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#3

(#3) Joint STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Gilead Sciences, Inc. to Respond to Complaint by Gilead Sciences Inc (Ahern, Hunter). Agreed response deadline: 8/20/2021. Modified on 7/21/2021 to include full document title and response deadline (LTR, Case Administrator). (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#2

(#2) First RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gilead Sciences Inc. (Ahern, Hunter) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCase transferred from Washington Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:21-cv-06461, filed 08/20/2021. (JW, ECF Admin) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER GRANTING #5 JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Case transferred to the Northern District of California. This file is CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LTR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Vaughn L Bresheare, John Doe 27. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2021 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berman, Steve) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER ACCEPTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. The parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Gilead Sciences, Inc. to Respond to Complaint, ECF No. #3 , is accepted and entered into the record. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No. #1 , on or before August 20, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LTR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Gilead Sciences, Inc. to Respond to Complaint by Gilead Sciences Inc (Ahern, Hunter). Agreed response deadline: 8/20/2021. Modified on 7/21/2021 to include full document title and response deadline (LTR, Case Administrator). (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) First RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gilead Sciences Inc. (Ahern, Hunter) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-3830930 Filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court Case File/Complaint)(Ahern, Hunter) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hunter K Ahern