This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2022 at 08:21:02 (UTC).

Brennan v. Patenaude & Felix A Professional Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 Brennan filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Patenaude Felix A Professional Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard A. Jones and Michelle L. Peterson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01547

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

Referral Judge

Michelle L. Peterson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carolyn Brennan

Defendant

Patenaude & Felix A Professional Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Boris Davidovskiy

Attorney at BORIS DAVIDOVSKIY, P.S.

6100 219Th St Sw Ste 480

Mountlake Terrace, WA 98043

Defendant Attorney

Marc Rosenberg

Attorney at LEE SMART PS INC

701 Pike St, Ste 1800 One Convention Pl

Seattle, WA 98101-3929

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Marc Rosenberg for Defendant Patenaude & Felix A Professional Corporation from 12/21/21 to 01/03/22, and 02/03/22 02/10/22. (Rosenberg, Marc) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Marc Rosenberg for Defendant Patenaude & Felix A Professional Corporation from November 23, 2021 through November 28, 2021, and December 21, 2021, through January 3, 2022. (Rosenberg, Marc) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Boris Davidovskiy for Plaintiff Carolyn Brennan from 12/13/21 - 1/3/21. (Davidovskiy, Boris) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

10 #7

Exhibit 7

10 #6

Exhibit 6

10 #5

Exhibit 5

10 #4

Exhibit 4

10 #3

Exhibit 3

10 #2

Exhibit 2

10 #1

Exhibit 1

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal by Patenaude & Felix A Professional Corporation.(Rosenberg, Marc) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 1/3/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/13/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/27/2021, by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TF) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#7

(#7) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Michelle L. Peterson pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (TF) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

6 #3

Exhibit 3 [Case Cover Sheet]

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Upon the request of the parties, and with good cause, the Court resets the following deadlines: Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/28/2022, Joint Status Report due by 2/4/2022. (KMP) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Marc Rosenberg for Defendant Patenaude & Felix A Professional Corporation from 12/21/21 to 01/03/22, and 02/03/22 02/10/22. (Rosenberg, Marc) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Marc Rosenberg for Defendant Patenaude & Felix A Professional Corporation from November 23, 2021 through November 28, 2021, and December 21, 2021, through January 3, 2022. (Rosenberg, Marc) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Boris Davidovskiy for Plaintiff Carolyn Brennan from 12/13/21 - 1/3/21. (Davidovskiy, Boris) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Patenaude & Felix A Professional Corporation with JURY DEMAND, filed by Carolyn Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Davidovskiy, Boris) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal by Patenaude & Felix A Professional Corporation.(Rosenberg, Marc) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 1/3/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/13/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/27/2021, by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TF) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Michelle L. Peterson pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (TF) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Patenaude & Felix A Professional Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [Complaint], #2 Exhibit 2 [Case Scheduling Order], #3 Exhibit 3 [Case Cover Sheet], #4 Exhibit 4 [Summons])(Rosenberg, Marc) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Patenaude & Felix A Professional Corporation (Rosenberg, Marc) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/23/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/23/2021. (ST) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - NOT submitted properly or NOT on file (Please refer to #LCR 101(b)(3) to file a proper jury demand) (ST) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketHon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (ST) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing in State Court re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Patenaude & Felix APC. (Rosenberg, Marc) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-13605-9 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7334253), filed by Patenaude & Felix APC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenberg, Marc) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PATENAUDE & FELIX is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc Rotenberg