This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2022 at 11:09:50 (UTC).

BRENNAN v. FIVE BELOW, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 BRENNAN filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against FIVE BELOW, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN S. MARSTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01383

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KAREN S. MARSTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESSICA BRENNAN

Defendant

FIVE BELOW, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN C. CONSOLE

Attorney at CONSOLE MATTIACCI LAW, LLC

1525 Locust Street, 9Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

DANIEL H. AIKEN

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

One Logan Square, 18Th & Cherry Sts.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MORGAN BROOKE RAZOR

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER

One Logan Square, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FIVE BELOW, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15844718.), filed by JESSICA BRENNAN.(CONSOLE, KEVIN) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to FIVE BELOW, INC. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/11/22 (jaa, ) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JESSICA BRENNAN. FIVE BELOW, INC. waiver sent on 4/12/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL H. AIKEN on behalf of FIVE BELOW, INC. with Certificate of Service(AIKEN, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MORGAN BROOKE RAZOR on behalf of FIVE BELOW, INC. with Certificate of Service(RAZOR, MORGAN) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MORGAN BROOKE RAZOR on behalf of FIVE BELOW, INC. with Certificate of Service(RAZOR, MORGAN) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL H. AIKEN on behalf of FIVE BELOW, INC. with Certificate of Service(AIKEN, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JESSICA BRENNAN. FIVE BELOW, INC. waiver sent on 4/12/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to FIVE BELOW, INC. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/11/22 (jaa, ) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FIVE BELOW, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15844718.), filed by JESSICA BRENNAN.(CONSOLE, KEVIN) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIVE BELOW INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel H. Aiken

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORGAN BROOKE RAZOR