This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2021 at 11:02:33 (UTC).

Brells v. NSF International

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Brells filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against NSF International. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nina Y. Wang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02766

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nina Y. Wang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristi Brells

Defendant

NSF International

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Michael Caleb Meyer

Attorney at Messner Reeves LLP

1430 Wynkoop Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Allison Joy Dodd

Attorney at Messner Reeves LLP-Denver

1430 Wynkoop Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Jean M. Peterson

Attorney at Messner Reeves LLP

1430 Wynkoop Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Raul Chacon, Jr.

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC-Denver

2000 South Colorado Boulevard, Tower Three

Denver, CO 80222

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#4

(#4) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/19/2021. Consent Form due by 11/29/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/6/2021. Scheduling Conference/Planning set for 12/13/2021 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kristi Brells. NSF International waiver sent on 10/19/2021, answer due 12/18/2021. (Meyer, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Chacon, Raul) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Allison Joy Dodd on behalf of NSF InternationalAttorney Allison Joy Dodd added to party NSF International(pty:dft) (Dodd, Allison) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only) re: Unopposed Motion to Withdraw

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines by Defendant NSF International. (Chacon, Raul) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Allison Joy Dodd on behalf of Kristi BrellsAttorney Allison Joy Dodd added to party Kristi Brells(pty:pla) (Dodd, Allison) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jean M. Peterson on behalf of Kristi BrellsAttorney Jean M. Peterson added to party Kristi Brells(pty:pla) (Peterson, Jean) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jean M. Peterson on behalf of Kristi BrellsAttorney Jean M. Peterson added to party Kristi Brells(pty:pla) (Peterson, Jean) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Allison Joy Dodd on behalf of Kristi BrellsAttorney Allison Joy Dodd added to party Kristi Brells(pty:pla) (Dodd, Allison) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Scheduling Conference and Reset Related Deadlines 19 is hereby GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference is RESET for 1/10/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. The Consent Form is due by 12/27/2021. The Proposed Scheduling Order is due 1/3/2022. The parties shall hold a pre-scheduling conference meeting and prepare a proposed Scheduling Order in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 and 26.1(a) on or before: 21 days prior to scheduling conference. The parties shall comply with the mandatory disclosure requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) on or before: 14 days after the pre-scheduling conference meeting. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/26/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, ) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER: The #8 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw is hereby GRANTED. Attorney Allison Joy Dodd is terminated as counsel of record for Defendant NSF International. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/26/2021. (nywlc3, ) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines by Defendant NSF International. (Chacon, Raul) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant NSF International. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) re: Unopposed Motion to Withdraw)(Dodd, Allison) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Allison Joy Dodd on behalf of NSF InternationalAttorney Allison Joy Dodd added to party NSF International(pty:dft) (Dodd, Allison) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Chacon, Raul) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kristi Brells. NSF International waiver sent on 10/19/2021, answer due 12/18/2021. (Meyer, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/19/2021. Consent Form due by 11/29/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/6/2021. Scheduling Conference/Planning set for 12/13/2021 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NSF International (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8125775)Attorney Michael Caleb Meyer added to party Kristi Brells(pty:pla), filed by Kristi Brells. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meyer, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NSF International is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raul Chacon, Jr.