This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2019 at 07:21:28 (UTC).

Brede v. Apple Computer, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 Brede filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Apple Computer, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James S. Gwin and Sara Lioi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02130

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

James S. Gwin

Sara Lioi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edward Brede

Defendant

Apple Computer, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rachel A. Sabo

Attorney at Friedmann Firm

1457 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43207

Peter G. Friedmann

Attorney at Friedmann Firm

1457 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43207

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Apple Computer, Inc. on 11/4/2019, filed on behalf of Edward Brede Related document(s) #7 . (B,R) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#7

(#7) Original Summons issued for service upon Apple Computer, Inc. (M,TL) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

6 #2

First Amended Complaint

6 #1

Summons

#6

(#6) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Edward Brede. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 First Amended Complaint)(Sabo, Rachel) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#5

(#5) First Amended complaint against Apple Computer, Inc.. Filed by Edward Brede. (Sabo, Rachel) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

4 #2

Appendix B - Exhibit List

4 #1

Appendix A - Witness List

#4

(#4) Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (B,R) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#3

(#3) Order of Recusal signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/17/2019. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. (S,KM) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (B,R) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Apple Computer, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9524950.. Filed by Edward Brede. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sabo, Rachel) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Apple Computer, Inc. on 11/4/2019, filed on behalf of Edward Brede Related document(s) #7 . (B,R) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Service by Clerk. Summons and Amended Complaint addressed to Apple Computer, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70180680000051532343. (B,R) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Original Summons issued for service upon Apple Computer, Inc. (M,TL) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Edward Brede. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 First Amended Complaint)(Sabo, Rachel) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) First Amended complaint against Apple Computer, Inc.. Filed by Edward Brede. (Sabo, Rachel) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (B,R) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Random Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (B,R) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, Judge James S. Gwin terminated. (B,R) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order of Recusal signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/17/2019. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. (S,KM) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (B,R) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (B,R) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand against Apple Computer, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9524950.. Filed by Edward Brede. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sabo, Rachel) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less