This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2020 at 09:35:08 (UTC).

Brazy-Courtney, Dorian v. Erickson, John

Case Summary

On 03/31/2020 Brazy-Courtney, Dorian filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Erickson, John. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00301

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dorian Brazy-Courtney

Madison, WI 53704

Defendant

John Erickson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Dale Thomas Golden

Attorney at Golden Scaz Gagain, PLLC

201 N. Armenia Avenue

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Envelope

#16

(#16) Submission titled Attorney Dale T. Golden appears to say by Plaintiff Dorian Brazy-Courtney. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

15 #1

Envelope

#15

(#15) Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Dorian Brazy-Courtney in Support of #9 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#14

(#14) Letter from clerk's office in response to #13 faxed submission from plaintiff. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#13

(#13) Brief in Opposition dated April 20, 2020 by Plaintiff Dorian Brazy-Courtney re: #2 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Erickson. (jef),(ps) Submission was received by fax on 4/21/20. (jef) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

12 #1

Envelope

#12

(#12) Brief in Opposition dated April 16, 2020 by Plaintiff Dorian Brazy-Courtney re: #2 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Erickson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) Modified docket text. (jef). (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#11

(#11) Brief in Opposition by Defendant John Erickson re: #9 Motion to Remand filed by Dorian Brazy-Courtney (Golden, Dale),(ps) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#10

(#10) Brief in Reply by Defendant John Erickson in Support of #2 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Golden, Dale),(ps) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

9 #3

Envelope

9 #2

Briefing notice with handwritten note

9 #1

La Crosse Co. Sheriff's Office certificate of service

#9

(#9) MOTION TO REMAND by Plaintiff Dorian Brazy-Courtney. (Attachments: #1 La Crosse Co. Sheriff's Office certificate of service, #2 Briefing notice with handwritten note, #3 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#8

(#8) Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Dorian Brazy-Courtney re: #2 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Erickson. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

7 #2

Envelope

7 #1

Certificate of Transmittal

#2

(#2) MOTION TO DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant John Erickson. (Golden, Dale),(ps) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Submission titled Attorney Dale T. Golden appears to say by Plaintiff Dorian Brazy-Courtney. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Dorian Brazy-Courtney in Support of #9 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter from clerk's office in response to #13 faxed submission from plaintiff. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Brief in Opposition dated April 20, 2020 by Plaintiff Dorian Brazy-Courtney re: #2 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Erickson. (jef),(ps) Submission was received by fax on 4/21/20. (jef) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Brief in Opposition dated April 16, 2020 by Plaintiff Dorian Brazy-Courtney re: #2 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Erickson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) Modified docket text. (jef). (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Brief in Opposition by Defendant John Erickson re: #9 Motion to Remand filed by Dorian Brazy-Courtney (Golden, Dale),(ps) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Brief in Reply by Defendant John Erickson in Support of #2 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Golden, Dale),(ps) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Briefing Deadlines as to Plaintiff's #9 MOTION TO REMAND. Defendants Brief in Opposition due 4/28/2020. Plaintiff's Brief in Reply due 5/8/2020. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION TO REMAND by Plaintiff Dorian Brazy-Courtney. (Attachments: #1 La Crosse Co. Sheriff's Office certificate of service, #2 Briefing notice with handwritten note, #3 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Dorian Brazy-Courtney re: #2 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Erickson. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Record from Dane County. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Transmittal, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter Supplement to Brief in Opposition re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Dorian Brazy-Courtney. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Dorian Brazy-Courtney re: #2 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Erickson. (Attachments: #1 Briefing Schedule, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Briefing Deadlines as to #2 MOTION TO DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 4/24/2020. Defendant's Brief in Reply due 5/4/2020. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice by Defendant John Erickson of Pendency of Other Actions. (Golden, Dale),(ps) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant John Erickson. (Golden, Dale),(ps) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION TO DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant John Erickson. (Golden, Dale),(ps) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketCase non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Wisconsin, Circuit Court, Dane County, case number 20SC01878. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2654158), filed by John Erickson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal filed in State Court, #5 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (Golden, Dale) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less