This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:19:38 (UTC).

BRAZINSKI v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 BRAZINSKI filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MARILYN HEFFLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05938

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARILYN HEFFLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NANCY L BRAZINSKI

Marcus Hook, PA 19061

Defendant

COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Interested Party

SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ATTEMPT TO APPOINT COUNSEL FORM THE COURT'S ATTORNEY PANEL FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES BY PLACING THIS CASE ON THE COURT'S EXTRANET SITE FOR REVIEW BY ATTORNYS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE PANEL. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 12/19/19. 12/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#10

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINT UPON SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION AND UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 12/19/19. 12/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) US Marshal Return Re: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SERVED UPON ATTORNEY GENERAL, AND SOCIAL SECURITY COMMISSIONER, ON 1/3/2020 BY FEDEX. (sg, ) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (amas) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ATTEMPT TO APPOINT COUNSEL FORM THE COURT'S ATTORNEY PANEL FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES BY PLACING THIS CASE ON THE COURT'S EXTRANET SITE FOR REVIEW BY ATTORNYS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE PANEL. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 12/19/19. 12/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Procedural Order 12/20/19 Entered and copies mailed. (mbh, ). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docket3 Summonses Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. 2 forwarded to U.S. Marshal Service on 12/20/19 and 1 given to U.S. Attorney (mbh, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINT UPON SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION AND UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 12/19/19. 12/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (dmc, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Social Security Magistrate Consent by NANCY L BRAZINSKI.. (dmc, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Social Security Notice of Case Assignment. Modified on 12/18/2019 (dmc, ). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES filed by NANCY L BRAZINSKI..(dmc, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by NANCY L BRAZINSKI. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Case Management Track Form)(dmc, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by NANCY L BRAZINSKI..(dmc, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.