This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2021 at 08:58:54 (UTC).

Bray - RESTRICTED - ACCEPT NO FILINGS v. Westville Correctional Facility et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Bray - RESTRICTED - ACCEPT NO FILINGS filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Westville Correctional Facility. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon E DeGuilio and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00777

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon E DeGuilio

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adam Bray

La Porte, IN 46350

Defendants

Westville Correctional Facility

Galipeau

Watts

Perez

Harvil

Hicks

Sonnenberg

Torres

Martin

A Watts

Pullins

Moore

J Algozine

K Simic

Gann

P Sonnenberg

T Cornett

B Malstaff

Heartline

12 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Cover letter

1 #3

Envelope

#2

#3

(#3) ORDER GRANTING Adam Bray until 11/15/2021, to resolve his filing fee status. CAUTIONING him if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/25/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) ORDER: The court DENIES Adam Bray leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 ; ORDERS Adam Bray, IDOC # 223933, to pay (and the facility having custody of him to automatically remit) to the clerk of this court 20% of the money he receives for each calendar month during which he receives $10.00 or more, until the $402.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk of court to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; DISMISSES this case WITHOUT PREJUDICE; DIRECTS the clerk of court to return, unfiled, any papers filed by or on behalf of Adam Bray (unless filed in 3:20-cv-645 or 3:21-cv-855), except for a notice of appeal or if filed in a criminal or habeas corpus proceeding, until he has paid in full all outstanding fees and sanctions in all civil actions in any federal court; DIRECTS the clerk to note on the docket of this case any attempted filings in violation of this order; and DIRECTS the clerk to ensure that a copy of this order is mailed to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 11/15/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Inmate Trust Fund)(lhc) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#6

(#6) CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (lhc) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Attempted violation - returned unfiled with copy of DE #5 . (nae) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (lhc) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The court DENIES Adam Bray leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 ; ORDERS Adam Bray, IDOC # 223933, to pay (and the facility having custody of him to automatically remit) to the clerk of this court 20% of the money he receives for each calendar month during which he receives $10.00 or more, until the $402.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk of court to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; DISMISSES this case WITHOUT PREJUDICE; DIRECTS the clerk of court to return, unfiled, any papers filed by or on behalf of Adam Bray (unless filed in 3:20-cv-645 or 3:21-cv-855), except for a notice of appeal or if filed in a criminal or habeas corpus proceeding, until he has paid in full all outstanding fees and sanctions in all civil actions in any federal court; DIRECTS the clerk to note on the docket of this case any attempted filings in violation of this order; and DIRECTS the clerk to ensure that a copy of this order is mailed to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 11/15/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Inmate Trust Fund)(lhc) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docket***Deficiency Deadline terminated. (kms) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Adam Bray. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kms) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER GRANTING Adam Bray until 11/15/2021, to resolve his filing fee status. CAUTIONING him if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/25/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Change of Address by Adam Bray from Westville Correctional Facility to Laporte County Community Corrections. (kms) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against J Algozine, Aramark, Armstrong, Borowski, Centerion, T Cornett, Dell, B Faubion, Galipeau, Gann, Harvil, Heartline, Hicks, Higgins, Johnson, Kintzelle, B Malstaff, Martin, Moore(Ms., Law Library), Moore(Ms., Mail-room), Perez, Pullins, K Simic, Sonnenberg, P Sonnenberg, Ryan Thompson, Torres, Trim, Washington, Watts, A Watts, Westville Correctional Facility, filed by Adam Bray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope)(No filing fee or IFP received)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Bray)(kms) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2021: #4 Additional Exhibits received in envelopes 8 through 14, #5 Envelopes 8 through 14) (nae). (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Harvil is a litigant

Latest cases where Galipeau is a litigant

Latest cases where Westville Correctional Facility is a litigant

Latest cases where WATTS AS TRUSTEE OF THE KARL J WATTS AND JANE WATTS REVOCABLE TRUST AGREEMENT, KARL J is a litigant