This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2019 at 06:08:20 (UTC).

Bray v. Department of Public Safety et al

Case Summary

On 03/07/2019 Bray filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Department of Public Safety. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00078

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bobby Ryan Bray

Defendants

Department of Public Safety

Oklahoma Highway Patrol

Daniel Eaton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bill J. Nunn

105 E Main St

Stigler, OK 74462

Defendant Attorney

Jon M. Williford

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General (OKC)

313 Ne 21St St

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jon M. Williford on behalf of Department of Public Safety (Williford, Jon) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jon M. Williford on behalf of Daniel Eaton (Williford, Jon) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - State Court Summons

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Petition

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Haskell County District Court, case number CJ-19-005 by Daniel Eaton (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Daniel Eaton (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jon M. Williford on behalf of Department of Public Safety (Williford, Jon) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 3/7/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1249008 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Daniel Eaton (Williford, Jon) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jon M. Williford on behalf of Daniel Eaton (Williford, Jon) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 3/14/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Haskell County District Court, case number CJ-19-005 by Daniel Eaton (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Daniel Eaton (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Department of Public Safety, Daniel Eaton, Oklahoma Highway Patrol by Bobby Ryan Bray (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.