Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2020 at 09:08:48 (UTC).

Braxton v. Enlivant Master Management Co. LLC

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Braxton filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Enlivant Master Management Co LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Solomon Oliver, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02111

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Solomon Oliver, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kanika Braxton

Defendant

Enlivant Master Management Co. LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony J. Lazzaro

Attorney at Lazzaro Law Firm

Heritage Building, Ste. 250, 34555 Chagrin Blvd.

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Lori M. Griffin

Attorney at Lazzaro Law Firm

Heritage Building, Ste. 250, 34555 Chagrin Blvd.

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Chastity L. Christy

Attorney at Lazzaro Law Firm

Heritage Building, Ste. 250, 34555 Chagrin Blvd.

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Defendant Attorneys

Ashley Allyn

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher - Irvine

3161 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

Donald C. Bulea

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart - Cleveland

127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Michele L. Maryott

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher - Irvine

3161 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Joint Motion to stay Proceedings until 12/3/2020 filed by Plaintiff Kanika Braxton. (Christy, Chastity) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

8 #2

Monay Williams Consent Form

8 #1

Sheronda Benson Consent Form

#8

(#8) Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Kanika Braxton. (Attachments: #1 Sheronda Benson Consent Form, #2 Monay Williams Consent Form)(Griffin, Lori) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

7 #2

LaJoi Wolfe Consent Form

7 #1

Tara Carney Consent Form

#7

(#7) Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Kanika Braxton. (Attachments: #1 Tara Carney Consent Form, #2 LaJoi Wolfe Consent Form)(Griffin, Lori) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

6 #2

Exhibit Maryott Certificate of Good Standing

6 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Michele Maryott

#6

(#6) Motion for attorney Michele L. Maryott to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10356709, filed by Defendant Enlivant Master Management Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michele Maryott, #2 Maryott Certificate of Good Standing)(Bulea, Donald) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

5 #2

Exhibit Ashley Allyn Certificate of Good Standing

5 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Ashley Allyn

#5

(#5) Motion for attorney Ashley Allyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10356664, filed by Defendant Enlivant Master Management Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley Allyn, #2 Ashley Allyn Certificate of Good Standing)(Bulea, Donald) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

4 #2

Exhibit Declaration of Michele Maryott

4 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Sandra Navarette

#4

(#4) Motion to Compel Bilateral Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Proceedings filed by Defendant Enlivant Master Management Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Sandra Navarette, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michele Maryott)(Bulea, Donald). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

3 #7

Sarah Prescott Consent Form

3 #2

Danielle Griffin Consent Form

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting the Parties' Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings (Related Doc #9 ). Within 30 days, or by December 3, 2020, the Parties will jointly inform the Court of the status of settlement negotiations by filing a Joint Status Report. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/6/2020.(R,Sh) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint Motion to stay Proceedings until 12/3/2020 filed by Plaintiff Kanika Braxton. (Christy, Chastity) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Kanika Braxton. (Attachments: #1 Sheronda Benson Consent Form, #2 Monay Williams Consent Form)(Griffin, Lori) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Kanika Braxton. (Attachments: #1 Tara Carney Consent Form, #2 LaJoi Wolfe Consent Form)(Griffin, Lori) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Ashley Allyn and Michele L. Maryott for Enlivant Master Management Co. LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Docs #5 , #6 ). Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 10/21/2020.(R,Sh) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion for attorney Michele L. Maryott to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10356709, filed by Defendant Enlivant Master Management Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michele Maryott, #2 Maryott Certificate of Good Standing)(Bulea, Donald) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion for attorney Ashley Allyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10356664, filed by Defendant Enlivant Master Management Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley Allyn, #2 Ashley Allyn Certificate of Good Standing)(Bulea, Donald) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to Compel Bilateral Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Proceedings filed by Defendant Enlivant Master Management Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Sandra Navarette, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michele Maryott)(Bulea, Donald). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Enlivant Master Management Co. LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7017 3040 0000 6033 4358. (H,SP) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Kanika Braxton. (Attachments: #1 Dominique Benson Consent Form, #2 Danielle Griffin Consent Form, #3 Thomas Hendricks Consent Form, #4 Selina Mccoy Consent Form, #5 Shelby Meyers Consent Form, #6 Deminaka Pilgrim Consent Form, #7 Sarah Prescott Consent Form, #8 Nicole Price Consent Form, #9 Tukessha Prince Consent Form, #10 Tamarey Scott Consent Form, #11 Phara Solages Consent Form, #12 Lakeisha Stephens Consent Form, #13 Bobbi Suter Consent Form, #14 Melissa Lynn Watson Consent Form, #15 Jarianne Woods Consent Form)(Griffin, Lori) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Enlivant Master Management Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketJudge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Enlivant Master Management Co. LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10276297.. Filed by Kanika Braxton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Enlivant Master Management Co. LLC) (Griffin, Lori) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald C. Bulea

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michele Leigh Maryott