This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/09/2023 at 23:03:28 (UTC).

Bravo et al v. Pelosi et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Bravo filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Pelosi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Jeffrey C. Manske. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00162

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Jeffrey C. Manske

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeremy Bravo

P. P.

Lindsey Nguyen

D. D.

Defendants

Mark Zuckerberg

Mike Podhorzer

Pete Sessions

Brad Raffensperger

Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee

Jack Dorsey

Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee

All 50 State Governors

All 50 State Secretaries of State

All Members of 117th U.S. Congress

647 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul M. Davis

Attorney at Paul M. Davis & Associates, P.C.

5720 Main St., # 2066

Frisco, TX 75034

Defendant Attorneys

Jacobus P. van der Ven

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave. Nw, Suite 500E

Washington, DC 20001

Jonathan Kravis

Attorney at Munger, Tolles and Olson LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave. Nw, Suite 500E

Washington, DC 20001

W. Ray Whitman

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Faith Johnson Lowry

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

601 Nw Loop 410, Suite 600

San Antonio, TX 78216

Lee M. Stoy, Jr.

Attorney at Office of the Georgia Attorney General

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

Elisabeth C. Frost

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 13Th St. Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005-3960

Emily R. Brailey

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

700 Thirteenth Street, N.W., Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005-3960

John Russell Hardin

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

500 N. Akard Street, Suite 3300

Dallas, TX 75201

Thomas S. Leatherbury

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins LLP

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 3900

Dallas, TX 75201

29 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#180

#179

#178

#177

#176

175 #1

Exhibit A

#175

#174

#173

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

315 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#180) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jennilyn Salinas (Davis, Paul) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#179) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Jack Dorsey Entry of Appearance. (Leatherbury, Thomas) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#178) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kevin Stitt (Ray, Lauren) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#177) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to (1) the Republican National Committee, (2) Arkansas Gov. Asa Hutchinson and Sec. John Thurston, (3) Ohio Gov. Mike DeWine and Sec. Frank LaRose, (4) New Hampshire Gov. Chris Sununu and Sec. William H. Gardner, and (5) Kansas Gov. Laura Kelly and Sec. Scott Schwab by Jennilyn Salinas. (Davis, Paul) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #173 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Further, pursuant to Local Court Rule AT 1(g), the applicant herein is EXEMPT from the $100 fee. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#176) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #174 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (lad) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#175) MOTION for Extension of Time to File (1) Response to Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 148) (in anticipation of motion for leave to file second amended complaint), (2) Deadline for Remaining Defendants to Respond to First Amended Complaint, (3) Deadline to complete service of process by Jennilyn Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#174) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jennilyn Salinas (Davis, Paul) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#173) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrea W. Trento for Larry Hogan, John C. Wobensmith. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#172) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Brian Kemp and Brad Raffensperger by Brian P. Kemp, Brad Raffensperger. (Stoy, Lee) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
205 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Pete Sessions. (bw) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jeremy Bravo, D. D., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P.. (Davis, Paul) (Entered: 02/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Nancy Pelosi. (bw) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jeremy Bravo, D. D., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P.. to Nancy Pelosi (Attachments: #1 Supplement 2 - Mitch McConnell, #2 Supplement 3 - Chuck Schumer, #3 Supplement 4 - Pete Sessions, #4 Supplement 5 - All Senators, #5 Supplement 6 - All Congressmen)(Davis, Paul) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jeremy Bravo, D. D., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Proposed Order)(Davis, Paul) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Ashley Hoff. (am) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jeremy Bravo, D. D., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P.. (Davis, Paul) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Jeremy Bravo, D. D., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P.. (Davis, Paul) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND APPLICATION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14510561), filed by P. P., Lindsey Nguyen, Jeremy Bravo, D. D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Davis, Paul) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee M. Stoy, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacobus P. van der Ven

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Faith Johnson Lowry

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Ian Kravis