This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2021 at 07:17:52 (UTC).

Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. v. Various John Does et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Various John Does. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aleta A. Trauger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00762

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aleta A. Trauger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.

Defendants

Various John Does

Various Jane Does

XYZ Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cara Burns

Attorney at Hicks, Mims, Kaplan & Burns

28202 Cabot Road, Suite 300

Laguna Niguel, CA 92677

Samuel F. Miller

Attorney at Miller Legal Partners PLLC

Suite 2000, 424 Church Street

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel F. Miller on behalf of Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. (Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

12 #1

Attachment Attachment

#12

(#12) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment)(Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

11 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

11 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

11 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Cara Burns filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

10 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

10 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

10 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#10

(#10) DECLARATION of Emily Holt filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. . (Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

8 #1

Attachment TRO Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment TRO Proposed Order)(Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons issued as to Various Jane Does, Various John Does, and XYZ Company. (Service copies returned to counsel by regular mail.) (jm) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2021 at 04:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel F. Miller on behalf of Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. (Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment)(Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Cara Burns filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLARATION of Emily Holt filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. . (Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment TRO Proposed Order)(Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons issued as to Various Jane Does, Various John Does, and XYZ Company. (Service copies returned to counsel by regular mail.) (jm) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2021 at 04:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jm) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Cara Burns: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/25/2021. (jm) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCA State Bar status verified as active for Cara Burns not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (jm) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Samuel F. Miller admitted to this court. (jm) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (jm) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) (DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR BY FILER) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Miller, Samuel) Modified on 10/4/2021 (bs). (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Various Jane Does, Various John Does, XYZ Company (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 06503459887), filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - TM Report, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel F. Miller