This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2019 at 07:15:10 (UTC).

Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. v. Does 1-100 et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Does 1-100. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rya W. Zobel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12061

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rya W. Zobel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.

Defendants

Jane Does 1-100

XYZ Company

John Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Lawrence Oliverio

Attorney at Polsinelli P.C.

21St Floor, 100 Cambridge Street

Boston, MA 02114

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION entered.(Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

14 #1

Exhibit Proofs of Service

#14

(#14) DECLARATION re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order of Emily Holt by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proofs of Service)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#13

(#13) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#12

(#12) Summons Issued as to Jane Does 1-100, John Does 1-100, XYZ Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#10

(#10) Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for TRO (LAU) (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc... (Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

8 #2

Exhibit B - Prior Other Odrs

8 #1

Exhibit A - Prior MA Odrs

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue by Michael Lawrence Oliverio on behalf of Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. filed by on behalf of Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Prior MA Odrs, #2 Exhibit B - Prior Other Odrs)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

7 #3

Exhibit C Infring Merch

7 #2

Exhibit B Autho Merch

7 #1

Exhibit A Tour

#7

(#7) DECLARATION re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue of Emily Holt by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Tour, #2 Exhibit B Autho Merch, #3 Exhibit C Infring Merch)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION entered.(Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Judge Rya W. Zobel: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#15) Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Show Cause Hearing held on 10/15/2019. No one appears for defendants. (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Oliverio) (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DECLARATION re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order of Emily Holt by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proofs of Service)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • (#18) RECEIPT: Receipt # 1BST076808 for monies received on 10/07/2019 in amount of $1,000.00, re: #17 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Summons Issued as to Jane Does 1-100, John Does 1-100, XYZ Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • (#11) Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 10/15/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for TRO (LAU) (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc... (Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue by Michael Lawrence Oliverio on behalf of Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. filed by on behalf of Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Prior MA Odrs, #2 Exhibit B - Prior Other Odrs)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DECLARATION re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue of Emily Holt by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Tour, #2 Exhibit B Autho Merch, #3 Exhibit C Infring Merch)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. of Related Cases (Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7909618 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Catagory Sheet)(Oliverio, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Lawrence Oliverio