This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/08/2019 at 07:41:11 (UTC).

Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. v. Does 1-100 et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Does 1-100. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller and Carolyn K. Delaney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01274

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Carolyn K. Delaney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.

Defendants

Jane Does 1-100

XYZ Company

John Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cara Rebecca Burns

Attorney at Hicks Mims Kaplan and Burns

28202 Cabot Road, Suite 300

Laguna Niguel, CA 92677

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) JUDGMENT dated *8/28/19* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/28/19. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#21

(#21) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/28/2019 ORDERING, that the Cash Bond posted by Plaintiff's counsel in the amount of One Thousand Dollars ($1,000) is exonerated, along with any interest and less any fees, and shall be released to counsel for the Plaintiff as set forth below; that the Court shall send the released Cash Bond to Plaintiff's counsel in the form of a check made payable as follows: Cara R. Burns, Hicks, Mims, Kaplan & Burns, 28202 Cabot Road, Suite 300, Laguna Niguel, CA 92677; and that the US Marshals for the Northern District of California are authorized to destroy all previously seized infringing merchandise delivered to them in this matter, or, if they are unable or unwilling to do so, to deliver the merchandise to the Clerk of Court for the Eastern District of California with a copy of this order. (cc CFS, USM) CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

(#20) PROPOSED ORDER re #18 Request by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burns, Cara) Modified on 8/27/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 08/26/2019)

19 #4

Exhibit D

19 #3

Exhibit C

19 #2

Exhibit B

19 #1

Exhibit A

#18

(#18) REQUEST to Exonerate Cash Bond and to Destroy Seized Merchandise by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. (Burns, Cara) Modified on 8/27/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 08/26/2019)

3 #2

Exhibit TRO Checklist

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#8) MINUTE ORDER: The court is in receipt of plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. #3 . The court will hold a telephonic hearing on the motion tomorrow morning, July 11, 2019, at 10:00 AM (Pacific Standard Time) in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller.)Following the issuance of this minute order, the courtroom deputy will contact plaintiff's counsel via email and provide instructions for connecting to the court's conference line for the hearing. It is so ORDERED. (Text Only Entry) (Souvannarath, A) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

2 #3

VDRP

2 #2

Consent Form

2 #1

Standing Order

#2

(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. Attorney Burns, Cara Rebecca added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8349388) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burns, Cara) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) JUDGMENT dated *8/28/19* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/28/19. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/28/2019 ORDERING, that the Cash Bond posted by Plaintiff's counsel in the amount of One Thousand Dollars ($1,000) is exonerated, along with any interest and less any fees, and shall be released to counsel for the Plaintiff as set forth below; that the Court shall send the released Cash Bond to Plaintiff's counsel in the form of a check made payable as follows: Cara R. Burns, Hicks, Mims, Kaplan & Burns, 28202 Cabot Road, Suite 300, Laguna Niguel, CA 92677; and that the US Marshals for the Northern District of California are authorized to destroy all previously seized infringing merchandise delivered to them in this matter, or, if they are unable or unwilling to do so, to deliver the merchandise to the Clerk of Court for the Eastern District of California with a copy of this order. (cc CFS, USM) CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) PROPOSED ORDER re #18 Request by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burns, Cara) Modified on 8/27/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) DECLARATION of Cara Burns re #18 Request. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Burns, Cara) Modified on 8/27/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REQUEST to Exonerate Cash Bond and to Destroy Seized Merchandise by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. (Burns, Cara) Modified on 8/27/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • (#17) CLERK'S NOTICE: The U.S. Marshal Service for the Northern District of California has confirmed the seized goods were received by that office on Friday, August 16, 2019. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/29/2019 ORDERING #9 For the reasons described in this order, the Temporary Restraining Order, Seizure Order and the Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order should not Issue, is hereby DISSOLVED, and the request for a preliminary injunction, #11 is DENIED. In compliance with 15:1116(d)(7), given that some merchandise has been seized by law enforcement officers under the court's prior order, plaintiff SHALL make arrangements for those law enforcement officers to deliver all merchandise seized by authorization of the seizure order, #9 to the court in the next 21 days. See 15:1116(d)(7) ("Any materials seized under this subsection shall be taken into the custody of the court.")(Reader, L) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Following hearing and good cause appearing, the Temporary Restraining Order, Seizure Order and the Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order previously issued by the court, ECF No. #9 , is hereby DISSOLVED, and plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction, ECF No. #11 , is DENIED. A written order of explanation will follow. SO ORDERED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • (#14) MINUTES for SHOW CAUSE HEARING held before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/25/2019. Plaintiff's Counsel, Cara Burns, present. No appearance on behalf of defendants. The court and counsel discussed plaintiff's request for a Preliminary Injunction. Matter submitted with an order to issue.Court Reporter: Kimberly Bennett. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DECLARATION of Emily Holt In Support of Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order to Issue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Burns, Cara) Modified on 7/24/2019 (Coll, A). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2019
  • RECEIPT number #CAE200099490 $1000.00 fbo Bravado International Group M by Class Action Research and Lit on 7/11/2019. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; SEIZURE ORDER; AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why a Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order should not issue signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/11/19. Defendants, John Does 1-100, Jane Does 1-100 and XYZ Company their true identities being unknown (collectively "Defendants") shall SHOW CAUSE 7/25/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, why an order should not be entered granting Plaintiff a preliminary injunction to enjoin the Defendants from manufacturing, distributing, selling or holding for sale "Infringing Merchandise" and to seize the same bearing the federally registered trademarks, service marks, likenesses, logos or other indicia of the Artist known as "SHAWN MENDES" (collectively, the "Artist's Trademarks"). Pending hearing and determination of this application, or the expiration of 14 days from the date hereof, the defendants are TEMPORARILY RESTRAINED from manufacturing, distributing and selling Infringing Merchandise bearing any or all of the Artist's Trademarks. Any and all on-duty federal, state or local law enforcement officer is hereby authorized to seize and maintain in their custody and control for delivery to this court any and all Infringing Merchandise bearing any or all of the Artist's Trademarks that Defendants attempt to sell or are holding for sale from 6 hours before to 6 hours after any performance of the tour within a 10 mile vicinity of the stadiums, arenas and other venues at which the Artist shall be performing, including but not limited to on 07/11/19 at the Golden 1 Center in Sacramento, California. This order be and is conditioned upon Plaintiff's filing with the Clerk an undertaking in the form of a bond, certified check, bank check, credit card or cash in the amount of $1,000 by 07/11/19 at 4:00 p.m., to secure the payment of such costs and damages not to exceed such sum as may be suffered or sustained by any party who is found to be wrongfully restrained hereby. Defendants' responsive papers, if any, are due 07/19/19 at 4:00 p.m. Any reply is due 07/23/19 at 4:00 p.m. Any defendant can apply to this court to modify or dissolve this Order on 2 days' notice or shorter notice as this court may allow. A separate order of explanation to follow. (cc: Financial). (Benson, A.) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER: The court is in receipt of plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. #3 . The court will hold a telephonic hearing on the motion tomorrow morning, July 11, 2019, at 10:00 AM (Pacific Standard Time) in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller.)Following the issuance of this minute order, the courtroom deputy will contact plaintiff's counsel via email and provide instructions for connecting to the court's conference line for the hearing. It is so ORDERED. (Text Only Entry) (Souvannarath, A) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT on the Filing of a Trademark Action by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. (Burns, Cara) Modified on 7/10/2019 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of COUNSEL per FRCP Rule 65. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Prior ED orders, #2 Exhibit B -Prior CA Orders, #3 Exhibit C - Prior Other Orders)(Burns, Cara) Modified on 7/10/2019 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DECLARATION of Emily Holt in support of #3 Motion for TRO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Concert Dates, #2 Exhibit B- Autho Merch, #3 Exhibit C- Infring Merch, #4 Exhibit D - Infrgers)(Burns, Cara) Modified on 7/10/2019 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEMORANDUM by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. in support of #3 TRO. (Burns, Cara) Modified on 7/10/2019 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit TRO Checklist)(Burns, Cara) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. Attorney Burns, Cara Rebecca added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8349388) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burns, Cara) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cara Rebecca Burns