This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2021 at 09:35:40 (UTC).

Brauning v. Christian et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Brauning filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Christian. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John F. Heil, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00199

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Heil, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jacob Wayne Brauning

Shawnee, OK 74804

Defendants

John Gilbert Christian

Charles Steven Kessinger

Lori Lynn Jackson

Gregory Darwin Pollard

Sonya Renea Chronister

Karen Lyn Dunnigan

Alvin Dean Files

Arnold Gordon Scott

Michael Lee Walker

Todd O'Neil Young

Derek Ray Stewart

Shannon D. Smith

Matthew Robert Haley

Steve Patrick Williams

Gary Leon Brooks

Candice Michelle Irby

William Richard Hayden

Cary Michael Jackson

Chance David Branscum

6 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#35

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

2 #1

Envelope

#2

#1

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Gary Leon Brooks - Served on 9/2/2021. (kdc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Shannon D. Smith - Served on 9/2/2021. (kdc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted re: Steve Patrick Williams. (kdc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Candice Michelle Irby - Served on 9/2/2021. (kdc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Matthew Robert Haley - Served on 9/2/2021. (kdc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Brandon Wayne Smith (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Vision Bank, N.A. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Andrew Duane Gibson (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Brandon Lee Tilley (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to James Robert Hamby (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sonya Renea Chronister (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Gregory Darwin Pollard (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Lori Lynn Jackson (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Charles Steven Kessinger (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to John Gilbert Christian (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER to Plaintiff with 285 forms(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III: Granting #3 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis.(acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Jacob Wayne Brauning Responses due by 7/20/2021(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Chance David Branscum, Gary Leon Brooks, John Gilbert Christian, Sonya Renea Chronister, Karen Lyn Dunnigan, Alvin Dean Files, Andrew Duane Gibson, Matthew Robert Haley, James Robert Hamby, William Richard Hayden, Candice Michelle Irby, Cary Michael Jackson, Lori Lynn Jackson, Charles Steven Kessinger, Oklahoma Heritage Bank, Gregory Darwin Pollard, Arnold Gordon Scott, Brandon Wayne Smith, Shannon D. Smith, Derek Ray Stewart, Brandon Lee Tilley, Vision Bank, N.A., Michael Lee Walker, Steve Patrick Williams, Todd O'Neil Young by Jacob Wayne Brauning (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jacob Wayne Brauning (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less