This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/16/2022 at 09:19:48 (UTC).

BRANHAM v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 BRANHAM filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt, Debra McVicker Lynch, Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01428

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Tanya Walton Pratt

Richard L. Young

Referral Judges

Debra McVicker Lynch

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSEPH DONALD BRANHAM

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Nations

Attorney at THE NATIONS LAW FIRM

9703 Richmond Avenue, Suite 200

Houston, TX 77042

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Howard L. Nations on behalf of Plaintiff JOSEPH DONALD BRANHAM. (Nations, Howard) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#12

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-01031-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-01062-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01360-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01380-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01389-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01390-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01392-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01393-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01397-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01398-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01403-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01404-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01405-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01409-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01411-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01412-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01413-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01414-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01416-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01423-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01428-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01430-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01432-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01437-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06821-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06822-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06823-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06825-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06827-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06828-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06829-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06830-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06833-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06835-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06840-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06841-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06844-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06849-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#13

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of MDL Defendants WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-01031-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-01062-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01360-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01380-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01389-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01390-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01392-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01393-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01397-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01398-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01403-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01404-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01405-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01409-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01411-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01412-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01413-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01414-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01416-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01423-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01428-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01430-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01432-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01437-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06821-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06822-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06823-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06825-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06827-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06828-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06829-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06830-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06833-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06835-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06840-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06841-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06844-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06849-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Tanya Walton Pratt, Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:22-cv-01428-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DRB) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#4

(#4) Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/27/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of MDL Defendants WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-01031-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-01062-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01360-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01380-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01389-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01390-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01392-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01393-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01397-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01398-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01403-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01404-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01405-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01409-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01411-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01412-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01413-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01414-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01416-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01423-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01428-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01430-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01432-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01437-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06821-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06822-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06823-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06825-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06827-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06828-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06829-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06830-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06833-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06835-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06840-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06841-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06844-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06849-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-01031-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-01062-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01360-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01380-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01389-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01390-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01392-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01393-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01397-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01398-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01403-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01404-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01405-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01409-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01411-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01412-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01413-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01414-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01416-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01423-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01428-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01430-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01432-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01437-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06821-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06822-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06823-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06825-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06827-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06828-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06829-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06830-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06833-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06835-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06840-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06841-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06844-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06849-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • Docket(#5) Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:22-cv-01428-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01430-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01432-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01433-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01435-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01437-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 7/27/2022. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01428-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01430-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01432-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01433-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01435-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01437-RLY-TAB (LBT) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/27/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Tanya Walton Pratt, Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:22-cv-01428-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DRB) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Howard L. Nations on behalf of Plaintiff JOSEPH DONALD BRANHAM. (Nations, Howard) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, filed by JOSEPH DONALD BRANHAM. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7194507) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nations, Howard) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK MEDICAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kip S.M. McDonald