This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/05/2022 at 08:26:36 (UTC).

BRANDYWINE VALLEY PREMIER HOSPITALITY GROUP v. FIREMANSS FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 BRANDYWINE VALLEY PREMIER HOSPITALITY GROUP filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FIREMANSS FUND INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is GENE E.K. PRATTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02221

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GENE E.K. PRATTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRANDYWINE VALLEY PREMIER HOSPITALITY GROUP, ETAL, T/A CONCORDVILLE INN & MENDENALL INN

BRANDYWINE VALLEY PREMIER HOSPITALITY GROUP

Defendants

FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

FIREMANS'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY JOSEPH DIULIO

Attorney at Wheeler, DiUlio & Barnabei, P.C.

1617 Jfk Blvd., Ste 1270

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

JOSEPH KERNEN

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

SARAH E. KALMAN

Attorney at DLA PIPER (US)

One Liberty Place, Suite 5000

Philadelpha, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Designation Form

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company with Certificate of Service by FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY.(KERNEN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH E. KALMAN on behalf of FIREMANS'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY (KALMAN, SARAH) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH KERNEN on behalf of FIREMANS'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(KERNEN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Supplement

6 #2

Supplement

6 #3

Supplement

#7

(#7) Report Of Damages in excess of 150k by BRANDYWINE VALLEY PREMIER HOSPITALITY GROUP. (DIULIO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#8

(#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BRANDYWINE VALLEY PREMIER HOSPITALITY GROUP. (DIULIO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketArbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought.(SEE PAPER #7 FOR PDF)(md) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BRANDYWINE VALLEY PREMIER HOSPITALITY GROUP. (DIULIO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Report Of Damages in excess of 150k by BRANDYWINE VALLEY PREMIER HOSPITALITY GROUP. (DIULIO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/4/2022 at 4:00 PM IN Chambers BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(sfl) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH KERNEN on behalf of FIREMANS'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(KERNEN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docket(#4) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ke) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH E. KALMAN on behalf of FIREMANS'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY (KALMAN, SARAH) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company with Certificate of Service by FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY.(KERNEN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15965655), filed by FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(KERNEN, JOSEPH) (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/7/2022) (sbt). (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Firemans Fund Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY JOSEPH DIULIO