This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2019 at 10:18:33 (UTC).

Brandy McDonald v. Orthopedic Associates, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 Brandy McDonald filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Orthopedic Associates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles A. Shaw. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00908

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles A. Shaw

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandy McDonald

Defendant

Orthopedic Associates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cyrus C. Dashtaki

Melvin David Kennedy

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth S. Silker

Steven H. Schwartz

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER -....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC's Motion for a Protective Order Relating to the Medical Condition of a Non-Party is DENIED, without prejudice. [Doc. 6]. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 6/20/2019. (MRC) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Silker, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#7

(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Silker for Defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC. (Silker, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#5

(#5) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Orthopedic Associates, LLC.(Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Steven H. Schwartz for Defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Cyrus C. Dashtaki for Plaintiff Brandy McDonald. (Dashtaki, Cyrus) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Brandy McDonald.. (Kennedy, Melvin) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

1 #6

Waiver of Service

1 #5

Original Filing Form

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

MCHR Right to Sue Charging Letter Exhibit C - MCHR RTS

1 #2

EEOC Right to Sue Charging Letter Exhibit B - EEOC RTS

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Charge

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC with receipt number 0865-7146700, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Brandy McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Charge, #2 EEOC Right to Sue Charging Letter Exhibit B - EEOC RTS, #3 MCHR Right to Sue Charging Letter Exhibit C - MCHR RTS, #4 Civil Cover Sheet , #5 Original Filing Form, #6 Waiver of Service)(Kennedy, Melvin) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER -....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC's Motion for a Protective Order Relating to the Medical Condition of a Non-Party is DENIED, without prejudice. [Doc. 6]. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 6/20/2019. (MRC) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Silker, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Silker for Defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC. (Silker, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Orthopedic Associates, LLC.(Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Steven H. Schwartz for Defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Cyrus C. Dashtaki for Plaintiff Brandy McDonald. (Dashtaki, Cyrus) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Brandy McDonald.. (Kennedy, Melvin) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Charles A. Shaw. (BAK) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC with receipt number 0865-7146700, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Brandy McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Charge, #2 EEOC Right to Sue Charging Letter Exhibit B - EEOC RTS, #3 MCHR Right to Sue Charging Letter Exhibit C - MCHR RTS, #4 Civil Cover Sheet , #5 Original Filing Form, #6 Waiver of Service)(Kennedy, Melvin) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less