This case was last updated from PACER on 09/05/2020 at 11:12:06 (UTC).

Brandt v. Saul

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 Brandt filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04117

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian T. Brandt

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frank T Koch

Attorney at Harlan, Still & Koch

P. O. Box 933, 515 Cherry, Ste. 300

Columbia, MO 65205

Defendant Attorney

OGCSSAR7

Attorney at Office of General Counsel-SSA Region 7

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 7/7/20 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint. Commissioner of Social Security, Office of the Regional Counsel served on 7/13/2020. filed by Frank T Koch on behalf of Brian T. Brandt.(Koch, Frank) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint. United States Attorney General served on 7/13/2020. filed by Frank T Koch on behalf of Brian T. Brandt.(Koch, Frank) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 7/13/2020 Social security answer due by 9/11/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 10/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Koch, Frank) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT 2:20-cv-04117-FJG filed by Frank T Koch on behalf of Brian T. Brandt. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 00000) filed byFrank T Koch on behalf of Brian T. Brandt. Service due by 10/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Koch, Frank) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 7/7/20 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frank T Koch on behalf of Brian T. Brandt. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/21/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Complaint)(Attorney Frank T Koch added to party Brian T. Brandt(pty:pla))(Koch, Frank) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less