This case was last updated from PACER on 08/26/2019 at 07:16:44 (UTC).

Brandt v. CSL Plasma, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Brandt filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CSL Plasma, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark A. Beatty and Nancy J. Rosenstengel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00702

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark A. Beatty

Presiding Judge

Nancy J. Rosenstengel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jamie Brandt

Defendant

CSL Plasma, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandon M. Wise

Attorney at Peiffer Wolf Carr & Kane, APLC

818 Lafayette Avenue, Floor 2

St. Louis, MO 63104

Defendant Attorneys

Michael V. Furlong

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips, LLP

10 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3450

Chicago, IL 60606

David L. Schenberg

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

7700 Bonhomme Avenue, Suite 650

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by CSL Plasma, Inc.. (Schenberg, David) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Partial filed by CSL Plasma, Inc.. (Schenberg, David) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss Partial by CSL Plasma, Inc.. Responses due by 9/12/2019 (Schenberg, David) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by CSL Plasma, Inc.. (Schenberg, David) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Schenberg on behalf of CSL Plasma, Inc. (Schenberg, David) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply - DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPONSIVELY PLEAD - by CSL Plasma, Inc.. (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

4 #1

Consent Brochure

#4

(#4) Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-702-NJR-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(lmb) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSL Plasma, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSL Behring LLC for CSL Plasma, Inc.. (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael V. Furlong on behalf of CSL Plasma, Inc. (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Affidavit

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 19L375 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3917102), filed by CSL Plasma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by CSL Plasma, Inc.. (Schenberg, David) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Partial filed by CSL Plasma, Inc.. (Schenberg, David) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss Partial by CSL Plasma, Inc.. Responses due by 9/12/2019 (Schenberg, David) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading by 8/9/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 8/2/2019. (jer)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by CSL Plasma, Inc.. (Schenberg, David) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Schenberg on behalf of CSL Plasma, Inc. (Schenberg, David) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Set Deadlines: CSL Plasma, Inc. answer due 8/5/2019. (kek) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is now due on or before August 5, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 7/1/2019. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply - DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPONSIVELY PLEAD - by CSL Plasma, Inc.. (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-702-NJR-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(lmb) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSL Plasma, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSL Behring LLC for CSL Plasma, Inc.. (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael V. Furlong on behalf of CSL Plasma, Inc. (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 19L375 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3917102), filed by CSL Plasma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.