Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 10:39:09 (UTC).

BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC v. POWER PIPING COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against POWER PIPING COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen P. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00386

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maureen P. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC

BRAND ENERGY SERVICES, LLC

Defendant

POWER PIPING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

W. Alan Torrance, Jr.

Attorney at Dickie, McCamey & Chilcote

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-5402

Jason P. Webb

Attorney at DIckie, McCamey & Chilcote

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Affidavit

#11

(#11) REQUEST by BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC for entry of DEFAULT against POWER PIPING COMPANY . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Torrance, W.) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Bryan Malanoski of Power Piping Company on April 9, 2019, filed by BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC., SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC. POWER PIPING COMPANY served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Torrance, W.) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#9

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#8

(#8) REDACTION VERSION OF DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL by BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Torrance, W.) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason P. Webb on behalf of BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Webb, Jason) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 04/08/2019. (tjw) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to POWER PIPING COMPANY (av) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Torrance, W.) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal as an Exhibit to Plaintiff's Complaint by BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Torrance, W.) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against POWER PIPING COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5090098), filed by BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST by BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC for entry of DEFAULT against POWER PIPING COMPANY . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Torrance, W.) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Bryan Malanoski of Power Piping Company on April 9, 2019, filed by BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC., SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC. POWER PIPING COMPANY served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Torrance, W.) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SEALED DOCUMENT (Full and Final Mutual Release and Agreement) by BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC. This document Sealed pursuant to #6 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (ept) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REDACTION VERSION OF DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL by BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Torrance, W.) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason P. Webb on behalf of BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Webb, Jason) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 04/08/2019. (tjw) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to POWER PIPING COMPANY (av) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Torrance, W.) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal as an Exhibit to Plaintiff's Complaint by BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Torrance, W.) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Torrance, W.) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against POWER PIPING COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5090098), filed by BRANDSAFWAY INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brandsafway Industries LLC is a litigant