This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2021 at 08:23:59 (UTC).

Brandonisio v. Nissan Motor Company, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 Brandonisio filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Nissan Motor Company, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sharion Aycock and David A. Sanders. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00232

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharion Aycock

Referral Judge

David A. Sanders

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guiseppe "Joe" Brandonisio

Defendants

John Does 1-10

Nissan of Corinth, LLC doing business as Corinth Auto Group

Nissan Motor Company, Ltd.

Nissan North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel Steven McHard

Attorney at MCHARD & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

15 Milbranch Road

Hattiesburg, MS 39402

Paul Manion Anderson

Attorney at MCHARD & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

15 Milbranch Road

Hattiesburg, MS 39402

Peyton James Moore

Attorney at McHARD & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

140 Mayfair Road, Suite 1500

Hattiesburg, MS 39402

Defendant Attorney

Caroline K. Ivanov

Attorney at WATKINS & EAGER PLLC

P.O. Box 650

Jackson, MS 39205

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #6

Summons Nissan Corinth

5 #5

Summons Nissan North America

5 #4

Exhibit 4 Repair Invoice

5 #3

Exhibit 3 Tow Bill

5 #2

Exhibit 2 Repair Invoice

5 #1

Exhibit 1 Bill of Sale

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Invoice

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Bill of Sale

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peyton James Moore on behalf of Guiseppe "Joe" Brandonisio (Moore, Peyton)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Ivanov, Caroline)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Manion Anderson on behalf of Guiseppe "Joe" Brandonisio Nissan North America, Inc. served on 12/7/2020. (Anderson, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Nissan North America, Inc.; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Reissued as to Nissan of Corinth, LLC; emailed to Attorney for service (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #5 Amended Complaint; Request for Issuance of Summons should be emailed to the Clerks e-mail address at: ecf_information@msnd.uscourts.gov. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nissan North America, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by Guiseppe "Joe" Brandonisio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Bill of Sale, #2 Exhibit 2 Repair Invoice, #3 Exhibit 3 Tow Bill, #4 Exhibit 4 Repair Invoice, #5 Summons Nissan North America, #6 Summons Nissan Corinth) (Anderson, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Manion Anderson on behalf of Guiseppe "Joe" Brandonisio Nissan of Corinth, LLC served on 11/13/2020. (Anderson, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Manion Anderson on behalf of Guiseppe "Joe" Brandonisio Nissan Motor Company, Ltd. served on 11/10/2020. (Anderson, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Nissan Motor Company, Ltd., Nissan of Corinth, LLC; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1873099, filed by Guiseppe "Joe" Brandonisio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bill of Sale, #2 Exhibit 2 - Invoice, #3 Exhibit 3 - Towing Bill, #4 Exhibit 4 - Invoice Dealer, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caroline K. Ivanov(Designation Retained)