This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 08:26:39 (UTC).

Brandon Gaynor v. Wireless Vision, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Brandon Gaynor filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Wireless Vision, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Alka Sagar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06368

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandon Gaynor

Defendants

Wireless Vision, LLC

Does 1-50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan M Robinson

Attorney at Robinson Bradford LLP

3439 Brookside Road Suite 212

Stockton, CA 92519

Matthew C Bradford

Attorney at Robinson Bradford LLP

3439 Brookside Road Suite 212

Stockton, CA 95219

Defendant Attorneys

Alexander Miller Chemers

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

400 South Hope Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Sage Stone

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

400 South Hope Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wireless Vision, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on July 17, 2020. (Stone, Sage) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wireless Vision, LLC, (Stone, Sage) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wireless Vision, LLC. (Stone, Sage) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #2

Declaration of Sage S. Stone ISO

1 #1

Declaration of Janice Rawls ISO

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pomona Courthouse South, case number 20PSCV00286 Receipt No: ACACDC-27254614 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Wireless Vision, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Janice Rawls ISO, #2 Declaration of Sage S. Stone ISO) (Attorney Sage Stone added to party Wireless Vision, LLC(pty:dft))(Stone, Sage) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wireless Vision, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on July 17, 2020. (Stone, Sage) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Wireless Vision, LLC. (filed in state court 7/17/20, submitted as document 1, p. 39)(esa) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Wireless Vision, LLC, filed by plaintiff Brandon Gaynor. (filed in state court 4/21/20, submitted as document 1, p. 20) (esa) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wireless Vision, LLC, (Stone, Sage) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wireless Vision, LLC. (Stone, Sage) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pomona Courthouse South, case number 20PSCV00286 Receipt No: ACACDC-27254614 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Wireless Vision, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Janice Rawls ISO, #2 Declaration of Sage S. Stone ISO) (Attorney Sage Stone added to party Wireless Vision, LLC(pty:dft))(Stone, Sage) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less