This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2022 at 07:08:01 (UTC).

Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc. v. United Healthcare Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against United Healthcare Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03669

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc., a California corporation

Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc.

Defendants

UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.

United Healthcare Insurance Company

Does 1 through 100

United HealthCare Services, Inc.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard D Williams

Attorney at Williams Law Firm PC

1539 Westwood Boulevard 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Mina Hakakian

Attorney at Williams Law Firm PC

1539 Westwood Boulevard 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorney

Robert C Bohner

Attorney at Hinshaw and Culbertson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #16 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time by which defendants United Healthcare Services, Inc. and United Healthcare Insurance Company must respond to the initial complaint herein be and hereby is further extended to and including August 10, 2022. (lom) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

16 #1

Proposed Order

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 06/26/2022)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary. The final pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine is scheduled for June 30, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. The trial is scheduled to begin on July 11, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. (iv) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United Healthcare Insurance Company answer now due 7/27/2022; United HealthCare Services, Inc., answer now due 7/27/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants United Healthcare Insurance Company; United HealthCare Services, Inc.,.(Attorney Robert C Bohner added to party United HealthCare Services, Inc.,(pty:dft), Attorney Robert C Bohner added to party United Healthcare Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Bohner, Robert) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc., upon Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc., served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Williams, Richard) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc., upon Defendant United Healthcare Insurance Company served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Williams, Richard) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (lh) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #16 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time by which defendants United Healthcare Services, Inc. and United Healthcare Insurance Company must respond to the initial complaint herein be and hereby is further extended to and including August 10, 2022. (lom) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 10, 2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants United HealthCare Services, Inc.,, United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bohner, Robert) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 06/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary. The final pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine is scheduled for June 30, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. The trial is scheduled to begin on July 11, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. (iv) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United Healthcare Insurance Company answer now due 7/27/2022; United HealthCare Services, Inc., answer now due 7/27/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants United Healthcare Insurance Company; United HealthCare Services, Inc.,.(Attorney Robert C Bohner added to party United HealthCare Services, Inc.,(pty:dft), Attorney Robert C Bohner added to party United Healthcare Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Bohner, Robert) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc., upon Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc., served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Williams, Richard) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc., upon Defendant United Healthcare Insurance Company served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Williams, Richard) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (lh) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (lh) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard D Williams counsel for Plaintiff Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc., a California corporation. Adding Mina Hakakian as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Richard D. Williams. (Williams, Richard) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc., a California corporation, identifying Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, United Healthcare Services, Inc. and United healthcare Insurance Company. (Williams, Richard) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc., a California corporation. (Williams, Richard) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc., a California corporation. (Williams, Richard) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33379238 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc., a California corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F) (Attorney Richard D Williams added to party Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc., a California corporation(pty:pla))(Williams, Richard) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRAND TARZANA SURGICAL INSTITUTE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where United Healthcare Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert C Bohner