This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/28/2022 at 01:01:55 (UTC).

Brakebush Transportation Inc v. D&M Carriers LLC

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Brakebush Transportation Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against D M Carriers LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam R Cummings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02492

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brakebush Transportation Inc

Defendants

D&M Carriers LLC d/b/a Freymiller

D&M Carriers LLC doing business as Freymiller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

W Sean O'Neil

Attorney at W Sean O'Neil Attorney at Law

1880 S Dairy Ashford Road, Suite 208

Houston, TX 77077

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Barrett Jones

Attorney at Canterbury Gooch Surratt Shapiro Stein Gaswirth & Jones PC

4851 Lbj Freeway, Suite 301

Dallas, TX 75244

Austin Holland Moorman

Attorney at Canterbury Gooch Surratt

4851 Lbj Freeway, Suite 301

Dallas, TX 75244

Kaitlyn Marie McClaine

Attorney at Canterbury PC

4851 Lbj Freeway, Suite 301

Dallas, TX 75244

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) ORDER denying #21 Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/28/2022) (ygl) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#26

(#26) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Brakebush Transportation Inc re #25 Response/Objection to Motion to Dismiss (O'Neil, W) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

25 #1

Proposed Order

#25

(#25) RESPONSE filed by Brakebush Transportation Inc re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Neil, W) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#24

(#24) ORDER granting #23 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 2/11/2022. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/7/2022) (jmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

23 #1

Proposed Order

#23

(#23) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brakebush Transportation Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Neil, W) Modified text and linkage on 2/7/2022 (jmg). (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#22

(#22) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by D&M Carriers LLC re #21 Answer to Amended Complaint and MOTION to Dismiss. (Jones, Michael) Modified text on 1/18/2022 (jmg). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint and MOTION to Dismiss filed by D&M Carriers LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Jones, Michael) Modified event text on 1/18/2022 (jmg). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

7 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to D&M Carriers LLC ; served on 10/20/2021. (O'Neil, W) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER denying #21 Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/28/2022) (ygl) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Brakebush Transportation Inc re #25 Response/Objection to Motion to Dismiss (O'Neil, W) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE filed by Brakebush Transportation Inc re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Neil, W) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #23 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 2/11/2022. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/7/2022) (jmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brakebush Transportation Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Neil, W) Modified text and linkage on 2/7/2022 (jmg). (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by D&M Carriers LLC re #21 Answer to Amended Complaint and MOTION to Dismiss. (Jones, Michael) Modified text on 1/18/2022 (jmg). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint and MOTION to Dismiss filed by D&M Carriers LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Jones, Michael) Modified event text on 1/18/2022 (jmg). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Barrett Jones on behalf of D&M Carriers LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. D&M Carriers LLC answer due by 1/14/2022. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/4/2022) (oyh) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by D&M Carriers LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by D&M Carriers LLC re #9 Answer to Complaint, and Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by D&M Carriers LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. D&M Carriers LLC's answer due 12/2/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 11/15/2021) (ygl) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to file Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by D&M Carriers LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint)Attorney Michael Barrett Jones added to party D&M Carriers LLC(pty:dft) (Jones, Michael) Modified event on 11/15/2021 (ygl). (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to D&M Carriers LLC ; served on 10/20/2021. (O'Neil, W) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to D&M Carriers LLC. (ygl) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Brakebush Transportation Inc. (O'Neil, W) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brakebush Transportation Inc. (O'Neil, W) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against D&M Carriers LLC filed by Brakebush Transportation Inc. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12293265) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet) (O'Neil, W) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D & M Carriers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael B. Jones(Designation Retained)