This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2021 at 07:05:37 (UTC).

Brady v. Target Corp

Case Summary

On December 6, 2021, Lauren Brady (“Plaintiff”), represented by Crystal N. Ibe and Debra Suzanne Edmondson of The Edmondson Law Firm PLLC, filed a civil right lawsuit against Target Corp. (“Defendant”), seeking compensation for all lost wages and benefits along with pre-judgement interest and other reliefs for the Defendant’s alleged discrimination of the Plaintiff based on her sex and race. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Northern District of Texas with Judge Ada Brown presiding.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Plaintiff contends that Target’s employees discriminated against her because of her color and sex on more than one occasion when they implemented and enforced policies and training procedures that directly discriminated against her, terminated her without any warning, and failed to provide her the same understanding and opportunity to explain her position that is given to non-white employees.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Ms. Brady had her initial Team Member orientation on May 18, 2020. Ms. Brady was told that the orientation would last the standard 3 hours long, but it was only 45 minutes long. The decision to curtail Ms. Brady’s orientation was made by Human Resource Partner Christina Boshart who told Ms. Brady that “Ms. Brady probably knew all this stuff already” due to her previous position as Store Team Leader. The day after her orientation, Ms. Brady began training with her then-peer Hernandez, who later became Ms. Brady’s supervisor” and “Neither Boshart or Hernandez referenced or referred to any part of the “Team Member Purchase Guidelines” (the “Purchase Guidelines”) found in the Target Employee Handbook during her training. Further, the Purchase Guidelines do not state that an infraction of the Purchasing Guidelines automatically leads to termination.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Ms. Brady was terminated by Hernandez and Target Human Resource Business Partner Lauren DeLeon on December 1, 2020, for “intentionally causing a loss to the company,” because Ms. Brady allegedly purchased a television on November 6, 2020, in a manner that did not follow the Purchase Guidelines, causing Target to sell the same television to the customer at a reduced price with an approximate $200.00 loss to the company on the same day.” The Plaintiff then alleged that, “Further, based on her knowledge of prior infractions by other non-white employees and how they were disciplined by Hernandez, Ms. Brady believes she was denied the opportunity to have a full investigation of the circumstances of her TV purchase and was also denied the opportunity to receive a Final Warning from Hernandez in accordance with the precedence set by similar situations.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Target intentionally treated Ms. Brady harsher than it would have treated a non-white person/male who was accused of the same violation of the Purchasing Guidelines.”

 

There are two claims of relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The first claim alleged is for discrimination in violation of Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964, 42 USC 2000e. et seq. The second claim alleged is for violation of the Texas Labor Code.

 

In her prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court for compensation for all lost wages and benefits, including loss of Social Security benefits along with pre- and post-judgement interests, reasonable attorney’s fees, costs of suit and any other relief the Court deems appropriate.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-03033

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ada Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lauren Brady

Defendant

Target Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Debra Suzanne Edmondson

Attorney at The Edmondson Law Firm PLLC

1100 E. Southlake Blvdsuite 400

Southlake, TX 76092

Crystal Ndidi Ibe

Attorney at The Edmondson Law Firm PLLC

1100 E Southlake Blvdsuite 400

Southlake, TX 76092

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Target Corp filed by Lauren Brady. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12432980) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Edmondson, Debra) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Target Corp. (oyh) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Target Corp. (oyh) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Target Corp filed by Lauren Brady. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12432980) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Edmondson, Debra) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant