This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/29/2020 at 09:08:58 (UTC).

Brady v. Sentinel Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Brady filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Sentinel Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leigh Martin May. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04450

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pamela K. Brady, DDS

Defendants

The Hartford Insurance Company

Sentinel Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harold L. Johnson

Attorney at The Law Office of Harold L. Johnson, LLC

950 Dannon View, Suite 4102

Atlanta, GA 30331

Defendant Attorney

John Gregory Perry

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP-Atl

Suite 2400, 271 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363-1017

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sentinel Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Sentinel Insurance Company. (Perry, John) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#8

(#8) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

7 #4

Exhibit C

7 #3

Exhibit B

7 #2

Exhibit A

7 #1

Brief

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Sentinel Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Perry, John) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#6

(#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to Sentinel Insurance Company. (tmf) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Pamela K. Brady, DDS (Douglas, Chaka) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/3/2020. (tmf) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#3

(#3) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to The Hartford Insurance Company. (eop) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Pamela K. Brady, DDS. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10326134) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/02/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #7 MOTION to Dismiss , to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #9 Certificate of Interested Persons. Read and approved by LMM. (bnp) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sentinel Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Sentinel Insurance Company. (Perry, John) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Sentinel Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Perry, John) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to Sentinel Insurance Company. (tmf) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Pamela K. Brady, DDS (Douglas, Chaka) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/3/2020. (tmf) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to The Hartford Insurance Company. (eop) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Pamela K. Brady, DDS. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10326134) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less