This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 04:43:00 (UTC).

Brady v. IGS Realty Co. L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 Brady filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against IGS Realty Co L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nelson Stephen Roman, Ona T. Wang and Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-10142

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ona T. Wang

Presiding Judges

Nelson Stephen Roman

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James H. Brady

Wyckoff, NJ 07481

Defendants

Philippe Ifrah

IGS Realty Co. L.P.

IGS Realty Co. L.P. doing business as IGS Realty Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Gregory Evrett Sheindlin

Attorney at Sheindlin Law Firm

200 Vesey Street, 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10281

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from James H. Brady, dated 12/7/19 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that he filed his opposition papers three weeks early and with a Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, because of the very serious nature of this case with the blatant violation of the plaintiff's Constitutional Rights to due process, and because the Motion to Dismiss filed by Mr. Sheindlin on 11/27/19 proves conclusively that there is no dispute that Mr. Ifrah, IGS Realty and Mr. Sheindlin were able to force the sale of the Brady's commercial co-op etc. Document filed by James H. Brady.(sc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#21

(#21) NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION & CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by James H. Brady.(sc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#20

(#20) PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT of James Brady IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by James H. Brady. (sc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#19

(#19) ORDER with respect to #5 Motion to Dismiss. On November 27, 2019, Defendants IGS Realty Co., LP and Philippe Ifrah ("Defendants") filed a motion to dismiss the complaint. (ECF 5). By Judge Engelmayer's order, Plaintiff's request for a default was denied as moot, and Plaintiff, proceeding pro se, was directed to respond to the motion to dismiss. (ECF 18). Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss by January 6, 2020. Defendants' reply, if any, is due January 13, 2020. The Clerk is respectfully requested to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/6/2019) (kv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#18

(#18) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default filed by James H. Brady. ENDORSEMENT: The Court denies any motion for default as moot. Defendants have already appeared and filed a motion to dismiss. Plaintiff should file a timely response to defendants' motion. This case remains referred to the Hon. Ona T. Wang, Magistrate Judge, for general pretrial purposes and for a report and recommendation on defendants' pending dispositive motion. All requests for relief should be addressed to Judge Wang. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail this Order to plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/5/2019) (jwh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#17

(#17) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by IGS Realty Co. L.P., Philippe Ifrah. Related Document Number: [5, 16]. (Sheindlin, Gregory) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 12/5/2019 (km). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#15

(#18) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default filed by James H. Brady. ENDORSEMENT: The Court denies any motion for default as moot. Defendants have already appeared and filed a motion to dismiss. Plaintiff should file a timely response to defendants' motion. This case remains referred to the Hon. Ona T. Wang, Magistrate Judge, for general pretrial purposes and for a report and recommendation on defendants' pending dispositive motion. All requests for relief should be addressed to Judge Wang. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail this Order to plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/5/2019) (jwh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

5 #10

Certificate of Service

5 #9

Memorandum of Law

5 #6

Exhibit Trial transcript

5 #5

Exhibit IGS Realty II, (08/27/2014) (ECF No. 117)

5 #2

Exhibit Complaint pages 1-31

5 #1

Declaration

#5

(#19) ORDER with respect to #5 Motion to Dismiss. On November 27, 2019, Defendants IGS Realty Co., LP and Philippe Ifrah ("Defendants") filed a motion to dismiss the complaint. (ECF 5). By Judge Engelmayer's order, Plaintiff's request for a default was denied as moot, and Plaintiff, proceeding pro se, was directed to respond to the motion to dismiss. (ECF 18). Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss by January 6, 2020. Defendants' reply, if any, is due January 13, 2020. The Clerk is respectfully requested to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/6/2019) (kv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/15/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from James H. Brady, dated 12/7/19 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that he filed his opposition papers three weeks early and with a Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, because of the very serious nature of this case with the blatant violation of the plaintiff's Constitutional Rights to due process, and because the Motion to Dismiss filed by Mr. Sheindlin on 11/27/19 proves conclusively that there is no dispute that Mr. Ifrah, IGS Realty and Mr. Sheindlin were able to force the sale of the Brady's commercial co-op etc. Document filed by James H. Brady.(sc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION & CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by James H. Brady.(sc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT of James Brady IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by James H. Brady. (sc) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #18 Memo Endorsement, to James H. Brady 510 Sicomac Ave. Wyckoff, NJ 07481. (aea) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #19 Order on Motion to Dismiss, to James H. Brady 510 Sicomac Ave. Wyckoff, NJ 07481. (vba) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/6/2020 Replies due by 1/13/2020. (kv) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER with respect to #5 Motion to Dismiss. On November 27, 2019, Defendants IGS Realty Co., LP and Philippe Ifrah ("Defendants") filed a motion to dismiss the complaint. (ECF 5). By Judge Engelmayer's order, Plaintiff's request for a default was denied as moot, and Plaintiff, proceeding pro se, was directed to respond to the motion to dismiss. (ECF 18). Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss by January 6, 2020. Defendants' reply, if any, is due January 13, 2020. The Clerk is respectfully requested to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/6/2019) (kv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Notice to attorney Gregory Sheindlin to RE-FILE Document No. #17 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The document needs to be titled as a proposed order. Please correct and re-file document. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Order found under the event list Proposed Orders. (km) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default filed by James H. Brady. ENDORSEMENT: The Court denies any motion for default as moot. Defendants have already appeared and filed a motion to dismiss. Plaintiff should file a timely response to defendants' motion. This case remains referred to the Hon. Ona T. Wang, Magistrate Judge, for general pretrial purposes and for a report and recommendation on defendants' pending dispositive motion. All requests for relief should be addressed to Judge Wang. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail this Order to plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/5/2019) (jwh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by IGS Realty Co. L.P., Philippe Ifrah. Related Document Number: [5, 16]. (Sheindlin, Gregory) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 12/5/2019 (km). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by IGS Realty Co. L.P., Philippe Ifrah. Related Document Number: #5 . (Sheindlin, Gregory) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 11/27/2019 (km). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by IGS Realty Co. L.P., Philippe Ifrah. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Complaint pages 1-31, #3 Exhibit Complaint pages 32-65, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Ifrah, #5 Exhibit IGS Realty II, (08/27/2014) (ECF No. 117), #6 Exhibit Trial transcript, #7 Exhibit IGS Action I (ECF No. 333), Judgement, #8 Exhibit Brady v. Ostrager, 19-CV-7122, #9 Memorandum of Law, #10 Certificate of Service)(Sheindlin, Gregory) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/15/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Judge Nelson Stephen Roman is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to IGS Realty Co. L.P., Philippe Ifrah. (sac) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sac) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less