This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2020 at 09:42:18 (UTC).

Bradshaw v. Salvaggio et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 Bradshaw filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Salvaggio. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fred Biery and Elizabeth S. Chestney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01168

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fred Biery

Referral Judge

Elizabeth S. Chestney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Will Bradshaw

Defendants

Catherine Rodriguez

Donna Charles

Kelly Kuenstler

Monica Alcocer

Joseph Salvaggio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Solomon M. Radner

Attorney at Excolo Law, PLLC

26700 Lahser Road, Suite 401

Southfield, MI 48033

Madeline M. Sinkovich

Attorney at Excolo Law, PLLC

26700 Lahser Rd., Suite 401

Southfield, MI 48033

Brandon J. Grable

Attorney at Grable Grimshaw Mora PLLC

1603 Babcock Rd Ste 280

San Antonio, TX 78229

Defendant Attorneys

Charles Straith Frigerio

Attorney at Attorney at Law

111 Soledad, Suite 840

San Antonio, TX 78205

Hector Xavier Saenz

Attorney at Law Ofcs. Of Chas. S Frigerio

Commerce Plaza Building, 111 Soledad, Suite 840

San Antonio, TX 78205

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/15/2020,, Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#29

(#29) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #27 Report and Recommendations, ORDERED that Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge (docket no. 27) is ACCEPTED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) such that Plaintiffs #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED and the Court issues the following limited injunction: defendants are ENJOINED and prohibited from removing plaintiff Will Bradshaw from his seat on the City Council of Leon Valley prior to a trial on the merits of this case. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

28 #1

Proposed Order

#28

(#28) OBJECTION to #27 Report and Recommendations by Monica Alcocer, Donna Charles, Kelly Kuenstler, Catherine Rodriguez, Joseph Salvaggio.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frigerio, Charles) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#27

(#27) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Will Bradshaw. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (vs1) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#25

(#25) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/27/2020 10:13:15 AM ]. File Size [ 59156 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:03:14 ]. (admin). (Entered: 10/28/2020)

24 #3

Exhibit 3 - Bates 45-48 Charter

24 #1

Exhibit 1 - Bates 5-12 Investigation

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Will Bradshaw. (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Donna Charles, Kelly Kuenstler, Catherine Rodriguez, Joseph Salvaggio. (wg) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

(#26) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney: Motion Hearing held on 10/27/2020 re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (EMERGENCY MOTION) filed by Will Bradshaw (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR-Gold.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing Exh. List)(wg) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#3

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Will Bradshaw. (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#21) ORIGINAL ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Monica Alcocer, Donna Charles, Kelly Kuenstler, Catherine Rodriguez, Joseph Salvaggio.(Frigerio, Charles) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/15/2020,, Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #27 Report and Recommendations, ORDERED that Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge (docket no. 27) is ACCEPTED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) such that Plaintiffs #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED and the Court issues the following limited injunction: defendants are ENJOINED and prohibited from removing plaintiff Will Bradshaw from his seat on the City Council of Leon Valley prior to a trial on the merits of this case. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) OBJECTION to #27 Report and Recommendations by Monica Alcocer, Donna Charles, Kelly Kuenstler, Catherine Rodriguez, Joseph Salvaggio.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frigerio, Charles) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Will Bradshaw. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (vs1) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/27/2020 10:13:15 AM ]. File Size [ 59156 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:03:14 ]. (admin). (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney: Motion Hearing held on 10/27/2020 re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (EMERGENCY MOTION) filed by Will Bradshaw (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR-Gold.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing Exh. List)(wg) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Filing Defendants' Notice of Filing Exhibits for TRO Hearing by Monica Alcocer, Donna Charles, Kelly Kuenstler, Catherine Rodriguez, Joseph Salvaggio (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bates 5-12 Investigation, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bates 6-18 Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Bates 45-48 Charter)(Frigerio, Charles) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Monica Alcocer, Donna Charles, Kelly Kuenstler, Catherine Rodriguez, Joseph Salvaggio. (Frigerio, Charles) (Entered: 10/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Miscellaneous Objection TO PLAINTIFF'S SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM by Monica Alcocer, Donna Charles, Kelly Kuenstler, Catherine Rodriguez, Joseph Salvaggio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frigerio, Charles) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORIGINAL ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Monica Alcocer, Donna Charles, Kelly Kuenstler, Catherine Rodriguez, Joseph Salvaggio.(Frigerio, Charles) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (EMERGENCY MOTION) filed by Will Bradshaw, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall promptly obtain service of process on defendants and promptly serve defendants with a copy of this Order, and IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that defendants shall file a response to plaintiffs request for apreliminary injunction (contained within docket no. 4) on or before October 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Will Bradshaw. (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Donna Charles, Kelly Kuenstler, Catherine Rodriguez, Joseph Salvaggio. (wg) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (EMERGENCY MOTION) by Will Bradshaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Will Bradshaw. (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Will Bradshaw. (Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14026747), filed by Will Bradshaw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Radner, Solomon) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon J. Grable

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Madeline M. Sinkovich

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Solomon Mordechai Radner