This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 18:58:41 (UTC).

Bradshaw v. Coleman et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Bradshaw filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Coleman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia D. Barksdale and Henry Lee Adams, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01445

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia D. Barksdale

Presiding Judge

Henry Lee Adams, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dante' J. Bradshaw

Lake City, FL 32055

Defendants

Richie C. Frederick

Aaron Butler

Daniel C. Caulk

Daniel Martin

Thomas Coleman

Eric Watson

Thomas Mansfield

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) JUDGMENT that pursuant to this Court's Order, entered January 7, 2020, is hereby entered dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/9/2020. (RH) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice, with instructions to the Clerk. Signed by Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 1/7/2020. (MO) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE titled "Writ for a "Free Man's" Right to Travel by Dante' J. Bradshaw (BD) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit 1 - Inmate Account Statement

#3

(#3) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Dante' J. Bradshaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Inmate Account Statement)(BD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT titled "Notice of Appeal" against Aaron Butler, Daniel C. Caulk, Thomas Coleman, Richie C. Frederick, Thomas Mansfield, Daniel Martin, Eric Watson filed by Dante' J. Bradshaw. (No IFP, no service copies) (BD) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

(#5) AMENDED STANDING ORDER Notifying Institution Regarding Inmate Claim of Suicidal Intent or Other Imminent Physical Harm. Signed by all active District Court Judges on 1/11/2018. (JSG) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Facts by Dante' J. Bradshaw. (JSG) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JUDGMENT that pursuant to this Court's Order, entered January 7, 2020, is hereby entered dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/9/2020. (RH) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice, with instructions to the Clerk. Signed by Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 1/7/2020. (MO) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED STANDING ORDER Notifying Institution Regarding Inmate Claim of Suicidal Intent or Other Imminent Physical Harm. Signed by all active District Court Judges on 1/11/2018. (JSG) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Facts by Dante' J. Bradshaw. (JSG) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Dante' J. Bradshaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Inmate Account Statement)(BD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE titled "Writ for a "Free Man's" Right to Travel by Dante' J. Bradshaw (BD) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT titled "Notice of Appeal" against Aaron Butler, Daniel C. Caulk, Thomas Coleman, Richie C. Frederick, Thomas Mansfield, Daniel Martin, Eric Watson filed by Dante' J. Bradshaw. (No IFP, no service copies) (BD) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.