This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 08:31:05 (UTC).

Bradshaw v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Bradshaw filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-14038

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Bradshaw

Defendants

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

Chattem, Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

Patheon Manufacturing Service LLC

Pfizer Inc.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Ajanta Pharma USA Inc.

Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC

Apotex Corporation

Appco Pharma LLC

Auro Health LLC

Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.

Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.

Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp.

Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roopal Premchand Luhana

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Bradshaw. Appco Pharma LLC waiver sent on 3/17/2023, response/answer due 5/16/2023. (Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Bradshaw. Apotex Corporation waiver sent on 3/9/2023, response/answer due 5/8/2023. (Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Bradshaw. Denton Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 3/9/2023, response/answer due 5/8/2023. (Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Bradshaw. Denton Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 3/9/2023, response/answer due 5/8/2023. (Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Bradshaw. Apotex Corporation waiver sent on 3/9/2023, response/answer due 5/8/2023. (Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Bradshaw. Appco Pharma LLC waiver sent on 3/17/2023, response/answer due 5/16/2023. (Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. Case is stayed and closed per Pretrial Order #80 in 20-MD-2924-RLR. (nwn) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Docket(#2) MDL 2924 Judge Assignment with Tag-Along Case Receipt from the Southern District of Florida. Judge Robin L. Rosenberg assigned FLSD Case Number 3:23-cv-14038. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-MD-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified. (nwn) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT James Bradshaw against Ajanta Pharma USA Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Apotex Corporation, Appco Pharma LLC, Auro Health LLC, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Chattem, Inc., Denton Pharma Inc. d/b/a Northwind Pharmaceuticals, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp., GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA, Golden State Medical Supply, Inc., Granules USA, Inc., L. Perrigo Co., Novitium Pharma LLC, Patheon Manufacturing Service LLC, Pfizer Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Strides Pharma, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. f/k/a Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16361762, filed by James Bradshaw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Luhana, Roopal) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less