This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2022 at 07:42:13 (UTC).

BRADLEY V. PLEASANT MOUNT WELDING, INC

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 BRADLEY filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against PLEASANT MOUNT WELDING, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F. Saporito, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00924

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Saporito, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Victoria Bradley

Defendant

Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Mediator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Prabhu Narahari

Attorney at Manes & Narahari LLC

429 Fourth Avenue, Ste 300

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Ryan A. Notzen

Attorney at Manes & Narahari LLC

One Oxford Centre

Ryan A Notzen

400 Fourth Avenue, Suite 300

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorneys

Danielle M. Mulcahey

Attorney at Wright & Reihner, P.C.

148 Adams Ave.

Scranton, PA 18503

Ryann D. Loftus

Attorney at Wright, Reihner & Mulcahey

148 Adams Avenue

Scranton, PA 18503

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Gerard J. Geiger

Attorney at Newman Williams

712 Monroe Street

Stroudsburg, PA 18360

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Gerard J. Geiger,Gerard J. Geiger for Mediator added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 7/25/22. (ms) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#19

(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2022. Discovery due by 1/31/2023. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 1/31/2023. Defendant Expert Report is due by 3/3/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 8/31/2022. Motions due by 3/3/2023. Supplemental due by 3/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 7/25/22. (ms) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#17

(#17) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc.. (Mulcahey, Danielle) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 7/11/22. (ms)(Copy to Mediation Account from Chambers) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint by Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc..(Mulcahey, Danielle) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#14

(#14) CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Saporito in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#13

(#13) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc. YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 7/13/2022 (ms) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#12

(#12) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Victoria Bradley YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 7/13/2022 (ms) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryann D. Loftus on behalf of Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc.. (Loftus, Ryann) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

7 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc.. (MULCAHEY, DANIELLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2022.] (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#5

(#7) RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Victoria Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Notzen, Ryan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2022.] (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by DANIELLE M. MULCAHEY on behalf of Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc. (MULCAHEY, DANIELLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2022.] (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michelle Ferguson re: served Complaint upon Dan Rokavic by Process Server on 5/20/22 (Notzen, Ryan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2022.] (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by PRABHU NARAHARI on behalf of Victoria Bradley (NARAHARI, PRABHU) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15783061.), filed by Victoria Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(Notzen, Ryan) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/14/2022) (sbt). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2022.] (Entered: 03/11/2022)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Gerard J. Geiger,Gerard J. Geiger for Mediator added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 7/25/22. (ms) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2022. Discovery due by 1/31/2023. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 1/31/2023. Defendant Expert Report is due by 3/3/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 8/31/2022. Motions due by 3/3/2023. Supplemental due by 3/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 7/25/22. (ms) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc.. (Mulcahey, Danielle) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 7/11/22. (ms)(Copy to Mediation Account from Chambers) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint by Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc..(Mulcahey, Danielle) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Saporito in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc. YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 7/13/2022 (ms) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Victoria Bradley YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 7/13/2022 (ms) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryann D. Loftus on behalf of Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc.. (Loftus, Ryann) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Sheet from ED of PA #9 Case Transferred In on 6/10/22- ED of PA District Transfer 2:22cv940 (sm) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCase Transferred to District of MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2022.] (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE (ECF NOS. 5-6), AND PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION #7 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THIS MATTER BE TRANSFERRED TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/9/22.6/10/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2022.] (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Victoria Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Notzen, Ryan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2022.] (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc.. (MULCAHEY, DANIELLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2022.] (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Change Venue filed by Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc...(MULCAHEY, DANIELLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2022.] (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by DANIELLE M. MULCAHEY on behalf of Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc. (MULCAHEY, DANIELLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2022.] (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michelle Ferguson re: served Complaint upon Dan Rokavic by Process Server on 5/20/22 (Notzen, Ryan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2022.] (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by PRABHU NARAHARI on behalf of Victoria Bradley (NARAHARI, PRABHU) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 3/14/22 (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2022.] (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Pleasant Mount Welding, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15783061.), filed by Victoria Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(Notzen, Ryan) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/14/2022) (sbt). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/10/2022.] (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gerard J. Geiger