This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/02/2019 at 08:34:34 (UTC).

Bradley v. Foster et al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 Bradley filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Foster. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Bruce Howe Hendricks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02819

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce Howe Hendricks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cory Bradley

Defendants

Rico Foster

Mabe Trucking Co Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond T Wooten

Attorney at Smith Jordan Lavery and Lee

Po Box 1207

Easley, SC 29641

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Steven Barrow

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow

Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29211

Richard Edward McLawhorn, Jr

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow

115 Cargill Way, Suite B

Hartsville, SC 29550

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1-Email Correspondence

1 #2

State Court Documents

#3

#4

#6

#7

#8

#9

9 #1

Supporting Documents filed Acknowledgment of Removal

#10

#11

#12

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Rico Foster, Mabe Trucking Co Inc.(McLawhorn, Richard) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/14/2019, Local Rule 26.03 Answers due by 11/14/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/6/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/6/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/5/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/5/2020, Discovery due by 8/6/2020, Mediation Due by 8/6/2020, Motions due by 9/4/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 12/4/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/7/19. (kmca) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Rico Foster, Mabe Trucking Co Inc, Cory Bradley.(McLawhorn, Richard) Modified on 11/7/2019: to add joint filer as listed (kmca). (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Greenville County. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents filed Acknowledgment of Removal)(McLawhorn, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/17/2019) (alew, ). Modified on 10/17/2019 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (alew, ). (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 4/6/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/10/19. (alew, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/31/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/14/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 11/14/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/5/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/6/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/5/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/5/2020, Discovery due by 4/6/2020, Motions due by 5/6/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 8/4/2020, Mediation Due by 4/6/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/10/19. (alew, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cory Bradley.(Wooten, Raymond) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Rico Foster, Mabe Trucking Co Inc.(alew, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Rico Foster, Mabe Trucking Co Inc.(alew, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-23-04898. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8704312), filed by Mabe Trucking Co Inc, Rico Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Email Correspondence, #2 State Court Documents)(alew, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/4/2019) (alew, ). Modified on 10/4/2019 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (alew, ). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mabie Trucking, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Edward McLawhorn, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Steven Barrow