This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:30:33 (UTC).

Bradley, Brandon v. Dane Co. Sheriff's Dept. et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Bradley, Brandon filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Dane Co Sheriff's Dept. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00995

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brandon D. Bradley, Sr.

Portage, WI 53901-0900

Brittney Hardaway Bradley

Portage, WI 53901-0900

Defendants

Dane Co. Sheriff's Dept.

John/Jane Doe Classification

John Doe Dep. Sheriff's

Jane Doe Nurses

Sgt.'s

David Mahoney

Not Classified By Court

CCI Prison Facility

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

5 #1

Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet

#5

(#5) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 0.10 for each case assessed. Initial partial filing fee(s) due 12/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/9/2019. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

8 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) Letter from clerk's office to plaintiff regarding illegible documents at dkts. #1 and #4 . (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 0.10 for each case assessed. Initial partial filing fee(s) due 12/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/9/2019. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter from clerk's office to plaintiff regarding illegible documents at dkts. #1 and #4 . (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2019: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brandon D. Bradley, Sr. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.