This case was last updated from PACER on 01/03/2020 at 08:09:07 (UTC).

Bradford v. Ouachita Correctional Center

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 Bradford filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Ouachita Correctional Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Karen L Hayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01433

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Karen L Hayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carlton Edward Bradford

Monroe, LA 71202

Defendant

Ouachita Correctional Center

 

Court Documents

#6

11 #2

IFP application

11 #1

Civil Rights complaint form

#11

#10

9 #1

*Restricted*

#9

8 #1

Transfer Letter

#8

#7

#5

4 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

4 #1

Remedy - page 5

#4

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms.Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 12/5/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights complaint form, #2 IFP application)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00471. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER ADOPTING #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS ORDERED that the Title 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint filed by Carlton Bradford is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, and the pending application to proceed in forma pauperis is deferred to that Court for resolution. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Letter)(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/4/2019.] (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Carlton Edward Bradford. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/4/2019.] (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 Complaint filed by Carlton Edward Bradford. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the captioned matter be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana. The pending #5 Motion to Proceed as a pauper is DEFERRED to the transferee court for consideration. Objections to R&R due by 2/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 2/14/19.(clc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/4/2019.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlton Edward Bradford. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/4/2019.] (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against Ouachita Correctional Center filed by Carlton Edward Bradford. (Attachments: #1 Remedy - page 5, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/4/2019.] (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 2/15/2019. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/4/2019.] (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlton Edward Bradford. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/4/2019.] (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DEFICIENT: COMPLAINT against Ouachita Correctional Center filed by Carlton Edward Bradford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/4/2019.] (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ouachita Correctional Center is a litigant