This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:50:35 (UTC).

Braddon v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Braddon filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John McBryde. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01008

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John McBryde

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Braddon

Justin, TX 76247

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

1100 Commerce Street, Third Floor

Dallas, TX 75242

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the court's order signed this date, the court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that the claims of plaintiff, Patricia Braddon, asserted in this action be, and are hereby, dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/9/2020) (tln) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER: The court ORDERS that plaintiff's claims be, and are hereby, dismissed for want of jurisdiction. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/9/2020) (tln) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#8

(#8) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by United States of America (wxc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Service by United States of America (wxc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#6

(#6) Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the standing order of documents #1 , #2 received. (wxc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#5

(#5) Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 12/5/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wxc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #7

Citation

1 #6

Affidavit of Military Status of Defendant(s)

1 #5

Small Claims Petition

1 #4

Index of State Court Records

1 #3

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Certification

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Justice Court, Precinct One, Wise County, Texas, case number JP1-19-CV-00012 filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement, #4 Index of State Court Records, #5 Small Claims Petition, #6 Affidavit of Military Status of Defendant(s), #7 Citation) (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9,10. Thu Jan 9 14:26:41 CST 2020 (crt) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the court's order signed this date, the court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that the claims of plaintiff, Patricia Braddon, asserted in this action be, and are hereby, dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/9/2020) (tln) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: The court ORDERS that plaintiff's claims be, and are hereby, dismissed for want of jurisdiction. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/9/2020) (tln) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by United States of America (wxc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Service by United States of America (wxc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the standing order of documents #1 , #2 received. (wxc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,4,5. Thu Dec 5 10:21:04 CST 2019 (crt) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 12/5/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wxc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Justice Court, Precinct One, Wise County, Texas, case number JP1-19-CV-00012 filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement, #4 Index of State Court Records, #5 Small Claims Petition, #6 Affidavit of Military Status of Defendant(s), #7 Citation) (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.