This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:32:32 (UTC).

Bradbury v. Commissioner Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Bradbury filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Mosman and Stacie F. Beckerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01418

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Michael W. Mosman

Stacie F. Beckerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria T. Bradbury

Defendant

Commissioner Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katherine Eitenmiller

Attorney at Harder Wells Baron & Manning

474 Willamette Street

Eugene, OR 97401

Katie Taylor

Attorney at Harder, Wells, Baron & Manning, P.C.

474 Willamette Street

Eugene, OR 97401

Defendant Attorney

Renata Gowie

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office District of Oregon

1000 Sw Third Ave, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Michael W. Mosman to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (eo) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7129701. Filed by Maria T. Bradbury against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Taylor, Katie) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less