This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 11:27:11 (UTC).

Bradburn v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 Bradburn filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher P. Tuite and Mary S. Scriven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00819

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

Presiding Judge

Mary S. Scriven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beverly Bradburn

Defendant

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven E. Hovsepian

Attorney at Barbas, Nunez, Sanders, Butler & Hovsepian

1802 W Cleveland St

Tampa, FL 33606-1852

Defendant Attorney

Brooke Chastain Juan

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, PA

1410 N Westshore Blvd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33607-4533

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Juan, Brooke) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Juan, Brooke) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Juan, Brooke) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Beverly Bradburn. (Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Beverly Bradburn. Related case(s): no (Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#5

(#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/1/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/17/2019. (KTT) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/1/2019. Counsel are relieved of the requirement to file a Case Management Report within the time prescribed. The Court is issuing a scheduling order sua sponte. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/17/2019. (KTT) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (LD) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15323525) filed by Beverly Bradburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons)(Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Juan, Brooke) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Juan, Brooke) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including June 6, 2019 to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/2/2019. (GMD) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Juan, Brooke) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Beverly Bradburn. (Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Beverly Bradburn. Related case(s): no (Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/1/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/17/2019. (KTT) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/1/2019. Counsel are relieved of the requirement to file a Case Management Report within the time prescribed. The Court is issuing a scheduling order sua sponte. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/17/2019. (KTT) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (LD) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-819-T-35CPT. (SJB) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15323525) filed by Beverly Bradburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons)(Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Prudential Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven E. Hovsepian