This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 08:00:41 (UTC).

Brackett v. Children's Hospital of Alabama, The

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Brackett filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Children's Hospital of Alabama, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray M Borden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00017

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray M Borden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Victor Brackett

Defendant

Children's Hospital of Alabama, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kira Y Fonteneau

Attorney at The Five Points Law Group LLC

2151 Highland Avenue Suite 205

Birmingham, AL 35205

Defendant Attorneys

Lance W Parmer

Attorney at Lehr Middlebrooks Vreeland & Thompson, P.C.

2021 3Rd Ave North, Ste. 300

Birmingham, AL 35203

Michael L Thompson

Attorney at LEHR MIDDLEBROOKS VREELAND & THOMPSON, PC

2021 Third Avenue North, P O Box 11945

Birmingham, AL 35202-1945

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Victor Brackett (MRR, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Victor Brackett. (MRR, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#12

(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (MRR, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lance W Parmer on behalf of Children's Hospital of Alabama, The (Parmer, Lance) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B

#14

(#14) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 3/4/20. (MRR, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Children's Hospital of Alabama, The, sent via certified mail (MRR, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than March 20, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after March 20,2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on March 4, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 2/4/20. (MRR, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Children's Hospital of Alabama, The. filed by Children's Hospital of Alabama, The (Thompson, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Children's Hospital of Alabama, The, filed by Victor Brackett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 2/4/20. (MRR, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Children's Hospital of Alabama, The.(Thompson, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 3/4/20. (MRR, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER: As the parties have unanimously consented to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge, the consent conference scheduled for today is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judges Gray M Borden on 3/4/2020. (RCP) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (MRR, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE to remind parties of consent conference scheduled at 10:00 AM on Wednesday, March 4, 2020; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be canceled (ASL) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 2/4/20. (MRR, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than March 20, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after March 20,2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on March 4, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 2/4/20. (MRR, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lance W Parmer on behalf of Children's Hospital of Alabama, The (Parmer, Lance) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Children's Hospital of Alabama, The. filed by Children's Hospital of Alabama, The (Thompson, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Children's Hospital of Alabama, The.(Thompson, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Children's Hospital of Alabama, The, sent via certified mail (MRR, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3511253 (B4601103259). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Children's Hospital of Alabama, The, filed by Victor Brackett. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ). (Fonteneau, Kira) Modified on 1/10/2020 (MRR, ). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Victor Brackett. (MRR, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Victor Brackett (MRR, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Children's Hospital of Alabama, The, filed by Victor Brackett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.