This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/16/2023 at 07:23:46 (UTC).

Brabus GmbH v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 02/15/2023 Brabus GmbH filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00925

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brabus GmbH

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

bestseller2017666

Business-carpartsstore

Carseller-2019

carstarhome_2018

chengtianyang

chenji6853

dyn3-3

jiangweiqiang_162

lili88999

manthz_ebiz_plaza

siyuachen8

Specialauto-store

tecra_auto_mart

wandelong118

wxzos-officialstore

xingz-86

xwqnw-5

commas

124 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Hierl

Robert Payton Mcmurray

William Benjamin Kalbac

 

Court Documents

#45

(#45) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 21, 61, 90 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#44

(#44) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 102, 142 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

#43

(#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The Court has reviewed the plaintiff's status report. Plaintiff are engaged in settlement negotiations with numerous defendants. Plaintiff will move for default judgment against remaining non-dismissed at a later date where appropriate. Status hearing is reset for 6/8/2023 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only; no appearance required). The plaintiff shall file a written status report by 6/1/2023. The court will enter an order in response to the status report. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#42

(#42) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 31, 44 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#41

(#41) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#40

(#40) STATUS Report by Brabus GmbH (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 14, 16 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

#38

(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 42 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

#37

(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 29, 45 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Brabus GmbH (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Brabus GmbH to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brabus GmbH by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brabus GmbH by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brabus GmbH by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 21, 61, 90 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 102, 142 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The Court has reviewed the plaintiff's status report. Plaintiff are engaged in settlement negotiations with numerous defendants. Plaintiff will move for default judgment against remaining non-dismissed at a later date where appropriate. Status hearing is reset for 6/8/2023 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only; no appearance required). The plaintiff shall file a written status report by 6/1/2023. The court will enter an order in response to the status report. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 31, 44 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) STATUS Report by Brabus GmbH (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 14, 16 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 42 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 29, 45 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brabus GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 56 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lm, ) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, ) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Brabus GmbH (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULE A by Plaintiff Brabus GmbH Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) Modified on 4/5/2023 (jg, ). (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Brabus GmbH to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brabus GmbH by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brabus GmbH by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brabus GmbH by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Brabus GmbH; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20349997. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less