This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2021 at 08:36:44 (UTC).

Braasch v. Money Matters Professional Collections LLC

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 Braasch filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Money Matters Professional Collections LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael G Gotsch, Sr and Damon R Leichty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00948

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

Presiding Judge

Damon R Leichty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joanne Braasch

Defendant

Money Matters Professional Collections LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis

Attorney at Consumer Law Partners LLC

333 N Michigan Ave Ste 1300

Chicago, IL 60601

David S Klain

Attorney at Consumer Law Partners LLC

333 N Michigan Ave Ste 1300

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorney

Sheri Bradtke McNeil

Attorney at Kopka Pinkus Dolin PC - CP/IN

9801 Connecticut Dr

Crown Point, IN 46307

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Settlement by Joanne Braasch (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joanne Braasch. Money Matters Professional Collections LLC waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sheri Bradtke McNeil on behalf of Money Matters Professional Collections LLC (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David S Klain on behalf of Joanne Braasch (Klain, David) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis on behalf of Joanne Braasch (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Money Matters Professional Collections LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4394241.), filed by Joanne Braasch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Having received notice that this case settled, the court ORDERS Settlement Papers to be filed by 2/19/2021. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 1/5/21. (dk) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Settlement by Joanne Braasch (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joanne Braasch. Money Matters Professional Collections LLC waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sheri Bradtke McNeil on behalf of Money Matters Professional Collections LLC (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Money Matters Professional Collections LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketJudge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. **NEW CASE** (mrm) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David S Klain on behalf of Joanne Braasch (Klain, David) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis on behalf of Joanne Braasch (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Money Matters Professional Collections LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4394241.), filed by Joanne Braasch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Scott Klain