This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2021 at 09:28:37 (UTC).

B&P Restaurant Group, LLC et al v. Eagan Insurance Agency, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 B P Restaurant Group, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Eagan Insurance Agency, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barry W Ashe and Michael North. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00555

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barry W Ashe

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Highlights Catering and Gourmet Shop, LLC

The Rum House of Baton Rouge, LLC

B&P Restaurant Group, LLC d/b/a The Rum House of New Orleans

The Red Dog Diner, LLC

Island Time Management, LLC

Rum House of Baton Rouge, LLC

Red Dog Diner, LLC

B&P Restaurant Group, LLC doing business as Rum House of New Orleans

Defendants

AmGuard Insurance Company

Eagan Insurance Agency, L.L.C.

ABC Insurance Company Unidentified Party

Unidentified Party

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ross Adam Ledet

Attorney at Boykin & Utley

400 Poydras St., Suite 1540

New Orleans, LA 70130

Richard B. Ehret

Attorney at Boykin & Utley

400 Poydras Street, Ste 1540

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Celeste R. Coco-Ewing

Attorney at Barrasso, Usdin, Kupperman, Freeman & Sarver, LLC

909 Poydras St., Suite 2350

New Orleans, LA 70112

Janelle E. Sharer

Attorney at Barrasso, Usdin, Kupperman, Freeman & Sarver, LLC

909 Poydras St., Suite 2350

New Orleans, LA 70112

Christopher R. Teske

Attorney at Pipes Miles Beckman, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1800, New Orleans

New Orleans, LA 70124

Laura Spansel Gravener

Attorney at Pipes Miles Beckman, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 1800

New Orleans, LA 70124

Lindsey Margaret Soboul

Attorney at Pipes Miles Beckman

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1800

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Request Letter

#17

(#17) ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to remand #8 is GRANTED, and this matter is REMANDED to state court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for attorneys fees and costs for the removal is DENIED. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 5/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Request Letter) (am) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#16

(#16) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (am) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER: GRANTING #14 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 5/5/2021. (am) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

14 #2

Proposed Pleading

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by B&P Restaurant Group, LLC, Highlights Catering and Gourmet Shop, LLC, Island Time Management, LLC, Red Dog Diner, LLC, Rum House of Baton Rouge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Ehret, Richard) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

13 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jordan Eagan

#13

(#13) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Eagan Insurance Agency, L.L.C. re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jordan Eagan)(Teske, Christopher) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AmGuard Insurance Company re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Coco-Ewing, Celeste) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

9 #12

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

9 #4

Affidavit Declaration of Celeste Coco-Ewing

9 #3

Appendix B

9 #2

Appendix A

8 #3

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

8 #2

Exhibit

8 #1

Memorandum in Support

#8

(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by B&P Restaurant Group, LLC, Highlights Catering and Gourmet Shop, LLC, Island Time Management, LLC, Red Dog Diner, LLC, Rum House of Baton Rouge, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission)(Ehret, Richard) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to remand #8 is GRANTED, and this matter is REMANDED to state court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for attorneys fees and costs for the removal is DENIED. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 5/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Request Letter) (am) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (am) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: GRANTING #14 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 5/5/2021. (am) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by B&P Restaurant Group, LLC, Highlights Catering and Gourmet Shop, LLC, Island Time Management, LLC, Red Dog Diner, LLC, Rum House of Baton Rouge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Ehret, Richard) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Eagan Insurance Agency, L.L.C. re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jordan Eagan)(Teske, Christopher) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AmGuard Insurance Company re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Coco-Ewing, Celeste) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #10 motion to continue is GRANTED, and the submission date of Amguard Insurance Company's #9 motion to dismiss is CONTINUED to June 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 4/21/2021.(cwa) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Motion to Dismiss by B&P Restaurant Group, LLC, Highlights Catering and Gourmet Shop, LLC, Island Time Management, LLC, Red Dog Diner, LLC, Rum House of Baton Rouge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ehret, Richard) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss by AmGuard Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Celeste Coco-Ewing, #5 Exhibit A - part 1, #6 Exhibit A - part 2, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D - part 1, #10 Exhibit D - part 2, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Notice of Submission)(Coco-Ewing, Celeste) Modified text on 4/15/2021 (am). (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by B&P Restaurant Group, LLC, Highlights Catering and Gourmet Shop, LLC, Island Time Management, LLC, Red Dog Diner, LLC, Rum House of Baton Rouge, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission)(Ehret, Richard) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to AmGuard Insurance Company answer due 4/14/2021. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/19/2021. (am) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by AmGuard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coco-Ewing, Celeste) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by AmGuard Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent WestGUARD Insurance Company, Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for AmGuard Insurance Company (Coco-Ewing, Celeste) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Compliance by AmGuard Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Coco-Ewing, Celeste) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE to Adverse Party by AmGuard Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Coco-Ewing, Celeste) Modified text on 3/18/2021 (sbs). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2020-08775 M-13 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ALAEDC-8780172) filed by AmGuard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (Part 1) State Court Record, #3 Exhibit A (Part 2) State Court Record, #4 Exhibit A (Part 3) State Court Record, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K) Attorney Celeste R. Coco-Ewing added to party AmGuard Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Coco-Ewing, Celeste) Modified text on 3/18/2021 (sbs). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura Spansel Gravener

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janelle E Sharer