This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2023 at 11:47:59 (UTC).

BP America Production Company v. Hamer et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 BP America Production Company filed an Other lawsuit against Hamer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine M. Arguello and Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03581

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine M. Arguello

Referral Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY

Defendants

Kenneth Nguyen

Wesley Hamer

ReadyWork LLC a Colorado limited liability company doing business as TASQ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Danielle Van Katwyk

Danielle L. Kitson

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel C. Curth

Harley Justin Goldstein

 

Court Documents

#49

(#49) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice by Plaintiff BP America Production Company. (Kitson, Danielle) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#46

(#46) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #37 Scheduling Order by Plaintiff BP America Production Company. (Kitson, Danielle) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#45

(#45) CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #44 Answer to Complaint by Defendants Wesley Hamer, Kenneth Nguyen, ReadyWork LLC. (Curth, Daniel) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#44

(#44) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wesley Hamer, Kenneth Nguyen, ReadyWork LLC.(Curth, Daniel) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#37

(#46) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #37 Scheduling Order by Plaintiff BP America Production Company. (Kitson, Danielle) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

2 #13

Exhibit 2 to Garcia Decl.

2 #12

Exhibit 1 to Garcia Decl.

2 #11

Exhibit B (Declaration of Rick Garcia)

2 #10

Exhibit 11 to Duffey Decl.

2 #9

Exhibit 10 to Duffey Decl.

2 #8

Exhibit 9 to Duffey Decl.

2 #7

Exhibit 6 to Duffey Decl.

2 #6

Exhibit 5 to Duffey Decl.

#2

1 #4

Summons Summons - ReadyWork

1 #2

Summons Summons - Hamer

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the #49 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed in this case. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice by Plaintiff BP America Production Company. (Kitson, Danielle) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER granting #46 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Non expert discovery due by 4/16/2021. Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures due: 5/14/2021. Deadline for Defendants to Depose Plaintiffs Experts: 6/28/2021. Defendants' Expert Disclosures: 7/28/2021. Deadline for Plaintiff to Depose Defendants' Experts: 9/3/2021. Deadline for Plaintiff to designate rebuttal experts 9/20/2021. Deadline for Defendants' to designate rebuttal experts 10/18/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/3/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/4/2022. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2021 is VACATED and RESET for 1/11/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/14/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MEMORANDUM regarding #46 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #37 Scheduling Order filed by BP America Production Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/13/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #37 Scheduling Order by Plaintiff BP America Production Company. (Kitson, Danielle) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #44 Answer to Complaint by Defendants Wesley Hamer, Kenneth Nguyen, ReadyWork LLC. (Curth, Daniel) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wesley Hamer, Kenneth Nguyen, ReadyWork LLC.(Curth, Daniel) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service of Defendants Answers to Plaintiffs Request for Admission by Defendants Wesley Hamer, Kenneth Nguyen, ReadyWork LLC. (Curth, Daniel) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/27/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER granting #39 Motion for Protective Order. The stipulated protective order is adopted, with one revision. Paragraph 8(a) is updated to reference D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1, which governs the filing of documents under restriction in this Court, rather than the Colorado Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/27/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, ) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Defendants Wesley Hamer, Kenneth Nguyen, ReadyWork LLC. (Goldstein, Harley) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Service of Process by Plaintiff BP America Production Company (Kitson, Danielle) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 12/23/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 602 before Judge Christine M. Arguello. Plaintiff shall properly serve Defendants with notice of the Complaint, the Motion, and a copy of this Order no later than Friday, 12/20/2019. If Defendants are not served with these documents, the hearing will be vacated. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/19/2019. (athom, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03581-CMA. (athom, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Plaintiff BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY.. (Kitson, Danielle) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Plaintiff BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY.. (Kitson, Danielle) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Matthew Duffey), #2 Exhibit 1 to Duffey Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Duffey Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Duffey Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Duffey Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 to Duffey Decl., #7 Exhibit 6 to Duffey Decl., #8 Exhibit 9 to Duffey Decl., #9 Exhibit 10 to Duffey Decl., #10 Exhibit 11 to Duffey Decl., #11 Exhibit B (Declaration of Rick Garcia), #12 Exhibit 1 to Garcia Decl., #13 Exhibit 2 to Garcia Decl., #14 Proposed Order (PDF Only) (Kitson, Danielle) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7051660)Attorney Danielle L. Kitson added to party BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY(pty:pla), filed by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Hamer, #3 Summons Summons - Nguyen, #4 Summons Summons - ReadyWork)(Kitson, Danielle) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less