This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2021 at 06:17:24 (UTC).

Bozin et al v. Deloitte Consulting LLP

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 Bozin filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Deloitte Consulting LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05070

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nicole Hornbeck

Alexandria Polichena

Bernadette Nolen

Timothy Smith

Daniel Bozin

Defendant

Deloitte Consulting LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc E. Dann

Attorney at DannLaw

P.O. Box 6031040

Cleveland, OH 44103

Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.

Attorney at Zimmerman Law Offices, P.C.

77 West Washington Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Javier Luis Merino

Attorney at The Dann Law Firm Co. LPA

372 Kinderkamack Road, Suite 5

Westwood, NJ 07675

Marc Edward Dann

Attorney at Dann Law Firm

Po Box 6031040

Cleveland, OH 44103

Brian D. Flick

Attorney at DannLaw

P.O. Box 6031040

Cleveland, OH 44103

Defendant Attorneys

Phyllis B. Sumner

Attorney at King & Spalding - Atlanta

1180 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Alvin Y. Lee

Attorney at King & Spalding - New York

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Daniel R. Warren

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland

127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Alvin Young Lee

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Lisa M. Ghannoum

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland

127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Daniel Rubin Warren

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP (Cleveland)

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

Elizabeth D. Adler

Attorney at King & Spalding - Atlanta

1180 Peachtree Street, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30309

Phyllis Buchen Sumner

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP (GA)

1180 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309

Dante A. Marinucci

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland

127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/25/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03962-LJL, 1:20-cv-04077-LJL, 1:20-cv-05070-LJL.(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 09/04/2021)

#38

RESTRICTED

#37

(#37) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (139 in 1:20-cv-03962-LJL) Letter, filed by Alexandria Polichena, Kathy Neal, Kelly Allison-Pickering, Briana Julius, Paul Culbertson, Bernadette Nolen, Alexander Cabot, Mark Niedelson, Nichelle Newland. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED., Motions due by 1/10/2022., Responses due by 1/24/2022, Status Conference set for 1/31/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/31/2021) (rj) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#36

(#36) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (127 in 1:20-cv-03962-LJL) Letter, filed by Kathy Neal, Kelly Allison-Pickering, Jessica Haiman, Bernadette Nolen, Mark Niedelson, Nichelle Newland, Alexandria Polichena, Paul Culbertson, Briana Julius, Alexander Cabot. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 8/18/2021.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/16/2021) (va) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#35

(#35) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (125 in 1:20-cv-3962) Letter, filed by Kathy Neal, Kelly Allison-Pickering, Jessica Haiman, Bernadette Nolen, Mark Niedelson, Nichelle Newland, Melissa Alexander, Alexandria Polichena, Briana Julius, Paul Culbertson, Alexander Cabot, Janet M. Burns. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Motion for preliminary approval of settlement to be filed on or before August 16, 2021. ( Motions due by 8/16/2021.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 6/24/2021) (va) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#34

(#34) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (123 in 1:20-cv-03962-LJL) Letter, filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. ENDORSEMENT: The request for an extension of the stay is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/30/2021) (va) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#33

(#33) MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (117) JOINT MOTION to Stay in case 1:20-cv-03962-LJL. ENDORSEMENT: The motion for a stay is GRANTED. Parties are directed to provide the Court with a joint status updated by April 30, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 1/29/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03962-LJL, 1:20-cv-04077-LJL, 1:20-cv-05070-LJL (jca) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#30

(#30) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (95 in 1:20-cv-03962-LJL) Letter, filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 11/13/2020.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 11/2/2020) (cf) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

4 #5

Exhibit E - Proposed Entry

4 #2

Exhibit B - Flick Declaration

4 #1

Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint

#4

(#4) Emergency Motion for temporary restraining order and/or Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith. (Related document(s) #1 ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Flick Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Nolen Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Hornbeck Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Proposed Entry) (Dann, Marc). Added Motion for preliminary injunction on 6/3/2020 (H,SP). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Deloitte LLP for Deloitte Consulting LLP filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Warren, Daniel) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 05/29/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit B - Shoupp Decl.

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#4) Emergency Motion for temporary restraining order and/or Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith. (Related document(s) #1 ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Flick Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Nolen Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Hornbeck Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Proposed Entry) (Dann, Marc). Added Motion for preliminary injunction on 6/3/2020 (H,SP). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/01/2020)

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/25/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03962-LJL, 1:20-cv-04077-LJL, 1:20-cv-05070-LJL.(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 09/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/25/2021 before Judge Lewis J. Liman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/27/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2021.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03962-LJL, 1:20-cv-04077-LJL, 1:20-cv-05070-LJL.(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 09/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (139 in 1:20-cv-03962-LJL) Letter, filed by Alexandria Polichena, Kathy Neal, Kelly Allison-Pickering, Briana Julius, Paul Culbertson, Bernadette Nolen, Alexander Cabot, Mark Niedelson, Nichelle Newland. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED., Motions due by 1/10/2022., Responses due by 1/24/2022, Status Conference set for 1/31/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/31/2021) (rj) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (127 in 1:20-cv-03962-LJL) Letter, filed by Kathy Neal, Kelly Allison-Pickering, Jessica Haiman, Bernadette Nolen, Mark Niedelson, Nichelle Newland, Alexandria Polichena, Paul Culbertson, Briana Julius, Alexander Cabot. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 8/18/2021.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/16/2021) (va) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (125 in 1:20-cv-3962) Letter, filed by Kathy Neal, Kelly Allison-Pickering, Jessica Haiman, Bernadette Nolen, Mark Niedelson, Nichelle Newland, Melissa Alexander, Alexandria Polichena, Briana Julius, Paul Culbertson, Alexander Cabot, Janet M. Burns. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Motion for preliminary approval of settlement to be filed on or before August 16, 2021. ( Motions due by 8/16/2021.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 6/24/2021) (va) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (123 in 1:20-cv-03962-LJL) Letter, filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. ENDORSEMENT: The request for an extension of the stay is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/30/2021) (va) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (117) JOINT MOTION to Stay in case 1:20-cv-03962-LJL. ENDORSEMENT: The motion for a stay is GRANTED. Parties are directed to provide the Court with a joint status updated by April 30, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 1/29/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03962-LJL, 1:20-cv-04077-LJL, 1:20-cv-05070-LJL (jca) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docket(#32) ORDER granting (109) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:20-cv-03962-LJL (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03962-LJL, 1:20-cv-04077-LJL, 1:20-cv-05070-LJL (Liman, Lewis) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • Docket(#31) ORDER granting (101) Letter Motion to Seal in case 1:20-cv-03962-LJL (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03962-LJL, 1:20-cv-04077-LJL, 1:20-cv-05070-LJL (Liman, Lewis) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (95 in 1:20-cv-03962-LJL) Letter, filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 11/13/2020.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 11/2/2020) (cf) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion for attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10018759, filed by Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. and Certificate of Good Standing attached hereto, #2 Proposed Order)(Dann, Marc) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion for attorney Alvin Y. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10016931, filed by Defendant Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alvin Lee, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Warren, Daniel) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion for attorney Elizabeth D. Adler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10016930, filed by Defendant Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth D. Adler, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Warren, Daniel) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion for attorney Phyllis B. Sumner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10016928, filed by Defendant Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Phyllis B. Sumner, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Warren, Daniel) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Emergency Motion for temporary restraining order and/or Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith. (Related document(s) #1 ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Flick Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Nolen Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Hornbeck Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Proposed Entry) (Dann, Marc). Added Motion for preliminary injunction on 6/3/2020 (H,SP). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketJudge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (L,MI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Deloitte LLP for Deloitte Consulting LLP filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Warren, Daniel) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-20-932778 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10010377.. Filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Shoupp Decl.) (Warren, Daniel) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deloitte Consulting LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc E. Dann

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.