This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 07:53:34 (UTC).

Bozeman Deaconess Health Services et al v. Federal Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 Bozeman Deaconess Health Services filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Federal Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dana L. Christensen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-00087

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana L. Christensen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Deaconess Intercity Imaging LLC

Advanced Medical Imaging

Intercity Radiology P.C.

Bozeman Deaconess Health Services

Defendants

Federal Insurance Company

ACE American Insurance Company

Chubb Services Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary M. Zadick

Attorney at UGRIN ALEXANDER ZADICK & HIGGINS

Po Box 1746

Great Falls, MT 59403-1746

John L. Amsden

Attorney at BECK, AMSDEN & STALPES, PLLC

1946 Stadium Drive, Suite 1

Bozeman, MT 59715

Anthony F. Jackson

Attorney at BECK, AMSDEN & STALPES, PLLC

1946 Stadium Drive, Suite 1

Bozeman, MT 59715

Defendant Attorney

Elizabeth Worth Lund

Attorney at BERG LILLY, PC

One West Main Street

Bozeman, MT 59715

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE American Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc. for ACE American Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Federal Insurance Company.. (Lund, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #7 Complaint by ACE American Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Federal Insurance Company. (Lund, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bozeman Deaconess Health Services, Deaconess Intercity Imaging LLC, Intercity Radiology P.C.. (Zadick, Gary) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#7

(#7) COMPLAINT filed in state court on 4/19/2019. (ASG) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

6 #3

Doc 4

6 #2

Doc 3

6 #1

Doc 2

#6

(#6) NOTICE of receipt of state court file (via file transferring service). (Attachments: #1 Doc 2, #2 Doc 3, #3 Doc 4, #4 Doc 5) (ASG) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have until June 18, 2019 to file their answer. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/3/2019. (ASG) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint and Jury Demand Elizabeth Worth Lund appearing for Defendants ACE American Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Federal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lund, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony F. Jackson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Anthony) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Amsden on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Amsden, John) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV 19-389., filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE American Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc. for ACE American Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Federal Insurance Company.. (Lund, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #7 Complaint by ACE American Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Federal Insurance Company. (Lund, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bozeman Deaconess Health Services, Deaconess Intercity Imaging LLC, Intercity Radiology P.C.. (Zadick, Gary) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) COMPLAINT filed in state court on 4/19/2019. (ASG) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of receipt of state court file (via file transferring service). (Attachments: #1 Doc 2, #2 Doc 3, #3 Doc 4, #4 Doc 5) (ASG) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have until June 18, 2019 to file their answer. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/3/2019. (ASG) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint and Jury Demand Elizabeth Worth Lund appearing for Defendants ACE American Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Federal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lund, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony F. Jackson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Anthony) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Amsden on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Amsden, John) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2309379 (KJL) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV 19-389., filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.