This case was last updated from PACER on 07/21/2019 at 07:40:51 (UTC).

Bozelko v. Federal Express Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 Bozelko filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Federal Express Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stefan R Underhill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00783

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stefan R Underhill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chandra Bozelko

Orange, CT 06477

Defendant

Federal Express Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine Murphy Bogard

Attorney at Brody & Associates-Wstpt

120 Post Road West, Suite 101

Westport, CT 06880

Ahsaki Baptist

Attorney at Federal Express Corporation

3620 Hacks Cross Road, Building B, 3Rd Floor

Memphis, TN 38120

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baptist, Ahsaki) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE by Federal Express Corporation of Filing Certificates of Good Standing (Baptist, Ahsaki) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Ahsaki Baptist on behalf of Federal Express Corporation (Baptist, Ahsaki) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Consent MOTION TO EXCUSE LOCAL COUNSEL by Federal Express Corporation.Responses due by 6/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bogard, Katherine) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

11 #2

Text of Proposed Order

11 #1

Memorandum in Support

#11

(#11) First MOTION to Dismiss by Federal Express Corporation.Responses due by 6/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bogard, Katherine) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

10 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Ahsaki Baptist

#10

(#10) MOTION for Attorney(s) Ahsaki E. Baptist to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5293474) by Federal Express Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Ahsaki Baptist)(Bogard, Katherine) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Federal Express Corporation, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Federal Express Corporation, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Federal Express Corporation, #8 Standing Protective Order, #4 Removal Statement filed by Federal Express Corporation, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Katherine Murphy Bogard on behalf of Federal Express Corporation Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#8

(#8) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/22/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/22/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#6

(#6) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2019. Discovery due by 11/21/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Federal Express Corporation of Pending Motions (Bogard, Katherine) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#3

(#3) First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Express Corporation identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for Federal Express Corporation. (Bogard, Katherine) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Express Corporation from Superior Court Judicial District of Ansonia-Milford at Milford, case number AAN-CV-19-5017534-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5289041, filed by Federal Express Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet)(Bogard, Katherine) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER approving #17 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/2/2019. (Smith, E) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baptist, Ahsaki) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE by Federal Express Corporation of Filing Certificates of Good Standing (Baptist, Ahsaki) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Ahsaki Baptist on behalf of Federal Express Corporation (Baptist, Ahsaki) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Excuse Local Counsel by Federal Express Corporation. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/3/2019 (Pincus, A). (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Consent MOTION TO EXCUSE LOCAL COUNSEL by Federal Express Corporation.Responses due by 6/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bogard, Katherine) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Attorney Ahsaki E. Baptist to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/23/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2019. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) First MOTION to Dismiss by Federal Express Corporation.Responses due by 6/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bogard, Katherine) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Attorney(s) Ahsaki E. Baptist to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5293474) by Federal Express Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Ahsaki Baptist)(Bogard, Katherine) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Federal Express Corporation, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Federal Express Corporation, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Federal Express Corporation, #8 Standing Protective Order, #4 Removal Statement filed by Federal Express Corporation, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Katherine Murphy Bogard on behalf of Federal Express Corporation Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/22/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/22/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2019. Discovery due by 11/21/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by Federal Express Corporation of Pending Motions (Bogard, Katherine) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Federal Express Corporation Removal Statement (Bogard, Katherine) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Express Corporation identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for Federal Express Corporation. (Bogard, Katherine) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Murphy Bogard on behalf of Federal Express Corporation (Bogard, Katherine) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Express Corporation from Superior Court Judicial District of Ansonia-Milford at Milford, case number AAN-CV-19-5017534-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5289041, filed by Federal Express Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet)(Bogard, Katherine) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.